Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2783774

EP2783774 - Non-corrosive soft-magnetic powder [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  11.09.2015
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip11.09.2015Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 14.10.2015  [2015/42]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BASF SE
Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38
67056 Ludwigshafen am Rhein / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/40]For all designated states
BASF SE
67056 Ludwigshafen / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Pagano, Sandro
Lange-Rötter-Straße 49
68167 Mannheim / DE
02 / Hwang, Jae Hyung
Lorscherstr. 38a
68519 Viernheim / DE
03 / Liebscher, Ralf
Fasanenweg 8
67308 Ottersheim / DE
04 / Prechtl, Frank
Oberlindau 59
60323 Frankfurt / DE
05 / Koch, Oliver
In den Backhauswiesen 18
67157 Wachenheim / DE
 [2014/40]
Representative(s)Rippel, Hans Christoph
Patentanwälte
Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler PartG mbB
Eastsite One
Seckenheimer Landstrasse 4
68163 Mannheim / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/40]Rippel, Hans Christoph
Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler LLP Eastsite One Seckenheimer Landstrasse 4
68163 Mannheim / DE
Application number, filing date13161713.628.03.2013
[2014/40]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2783774
Date:01.10.2014
Language:EN
[2014/40]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP10.09.2013
ClassificationInternational:B22F1/00, B22F1/02, H01F1/24, H01F1/26, H01F41/02
[2014/40]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/40]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Korrosionsbeständiges weichmagnetisches Pulver[2014/40]
English:Non-corrosive soft-magnetic powder[2014/40]
French:Poudre magnétique douce et non corrosive[2014/40]
Examination procedure28.03.2013Examination requested  [2014/40]
02.04.2015Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2015/42]
12.05.2015Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2015/42]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.201503   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XYI]US2009087684  (OMURA KAZUFUMI [JP] ET AL) [X] 1,4,6-10,12 * paragraph [0091] * * Comparative examples 4, 7, 13 * [Y] 2,11,13 [I] 3,5;
 [XAI]US6645286  (OSTERTAG WERNER [DE] ET AL) [X] 1,2,6,9-12 * column 4, line 57 - column 5, line 7 * * example - * [A] 4,5,13 [I] 3,7,8;
 [XAYI]US2009085002  (OMURA KAZUFUMI [JP] ET AL) [X] 1,7-10 * example 3 * * Comparative example 2 * [A] 4,5 [Y] 2,11,13 [I] 3,6,12;
 [XAYI]JPS58221202  (NIPPON SODA CO) [X] 1,7-10 * abstract * [A] 4,5 [Y] 2,11,13 [I] 3,6,12;
 [YDA]EP0810615  (HITACHI LTD [JP]; HITACHI POWDERED METALS [JP]) [YD] 2,11,13 * page 1, line 5 - line 8 * * example - * [A] 1,3-10,12
by applicantWO2007084363
 EP0810615
 EP0765199
 CN101525563
 CN100588743C
 WO2006071226
 DE3428121
 DE3940347
    - Ullmann's Encyclopedia of Industrial Chemistry 5th Edition, vol. A 14, page 599