Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2787349

EP2787349 - Method for detecting proteinopathy-specific antibodies in a biological sample [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  18.09.2015
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip18.09.2015Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 21.10.2015  [2015/43]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Affiris AG
Karl-Farkas-Gasse 22
1030 Wien / AT
[2014/41]
Inventor(s)01 / Mandler, Markus
Karl-Farkas-Gasse 22
1030 Vienna / AT
02 / Staffler, Günther
Karl-Farkas-Gasse 22
1030 Vienna / AT
03 / Santic, Radmila
Karl-Farkas-Gasse 22
1030 Vienna / AT
04 / Mairhofer, Andreas
Karl-Farkas-Gasse 22
1030 Vienna / AT
 [2014/41]
Representative(s)Sonn & Partner Patentanwälte
Riemergasse 14
1010 Wien / AT
[2014/41]
Application number, filing date13162109.603.04.2013
[2014/41]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2787349
Date:08.10.2014
Language:EN
[2014/41]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.11.2013
ClassificationInternational:G01N33/564, C07K14/47
[2014/41]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/41]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Erkennung von proteinopathiespezifischen Antikörpern in einer biologischen Probe[2014/41]
English:Method for detecting proteinopathy-specific antibodies in a biological sample[2014/41]
French:Procédé pour la détection d'anticorps Ass-spécifiques dans un échantillon biologique[2014/41]
Examination procedure03.04.2013Examination requested  [2014/41]
09.04.2015Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2015/43]
22.05.2015Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2015/43]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.04.201503   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[A]WO2010099199  (GIBBONS WINTON G [US]; HOLZMAN THOMAS F [US]; CHANG LEI [US]; LERNER C) [A] 1-8 * page 21; claim 21 *;
 [X]WO2010069603  (NEURIMMUNE THERAPEUTICS AG [CH]; UNIV ZUERICH [CH]; WEIHOFEN ANDREAS [) [X] 1-8 * page 13 - page 14 * * page 75 - page 76; figure 2 *
by applicant   - NUSSBAUM ET AL., NATURE, (20120502), vol. 485, no. 7400, pages 651 - 655
    - AD. ODDO ET AL., NEURON., (20040805), vol. 43, no. 3, pages 321 - 32
    - HAMPEL ET AL., NAT. REV. DRUG DISCOV., (2010), vol. 9, pages 560 - 574
    - SHAHANI ET AL., J. NEUROSCI., (2006), vol. 26, pages 6103 - 6114
    - HANGER ET AL., TRENDS IN MOL. MED., (2009), vol. 15, pages 112 - 119
    - BINDER ET AL., LUPUS15, (2005), pages 412 - 421
    - JANES ET AL., NAT. BIOTECHNOL., (2011), vol. 29, pages 602 - 604
    - CANNON ET AL., ANAL. BIOCHEM., (2004), vol. 328, pages 67 - 75
    - MISSAILIDIS ET AL., METHODS IN MOLECULAR BIOLOGY, (2003), vol. 248, pages 431 - 441
    - ANDERSON; WEBB, BMC BIOTECHNOLOGY, (2011), vol. 11, page 125
 WO2012EP68494