Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2787715

EP2787715 - Methods and devices for adjusting sensitivity of proximity sensor [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  03.02.2017
Database last updated on 22.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 14.11.2018  [2018/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BlackBerry Limited
2200 University Avenue East
Waterloo, ON N2K 0A7 / CA
[2016/13]
Former [2014/41]For all designated states
BlackBerry Limited
2200 University Avenue East
Waterloo, ON N2K 0A7 / CA
Inventor(s)01 / Dhavaloganathan, Thusenth
c/o Research In Motion Limited
295 Phillip Street
Extension 74631
Waterloo, Ontario N2L 3W8 / CA
 [2014/41]
Representative(s)Reichl, Wolfgang
MERH-IP
Matias Erny Reichl Hoffmann
Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Paul-Heyse-Straße 29
80336 München / DE
[2016/13]
Former [2014/41]Patel, Binesh , et al
Barker Brettell LLP
100 Hagley Road
Edgbaston
Birmingham West Midlands
B16 8QQ / GB
Application number, filing date13162481.905.04.2013
[2014/41]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2787715
Date:08.10.2014
Language:EN
[2014/41]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2787715
Date:30.03.2016
Language:EN
[2016/13]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.09.2013
ClassificationInternational:H04M1/67, H04W52/02, H04M1/725
[2014/41]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/41]
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtungen zum Einstellen der Empfindlichkeit eines Nähensensors[2014/41]
English:Methods and devices for adjusting sensitivity of proximity sensor[2014/41]
French:Procédés et dispositifs de réglage de sensibilité de capteur de proximité[2014/41]
Examination procedure05.04.2013Examination requested  [2014/41]
11.03.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
08.10.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.02.2016Fee for grant paid
05.02.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
05.02.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  08.10.2015
Opposition(s)03.01.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/10]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.04.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU05.04.2013
AL30.03.2016
AT30.03.2016
BE30.03.2016
BG30.03.2016
CY30.03.2016
CZ30.03.2016
DK30.03.2016
EE30.03.2016
ES30.03.2016
FI30.03.2016
HR30.03.2016
IT30.03.2016
LT30.03.2016
LV30.03.2016
MC30.03.2016
MK30.03.2016
PL30.03.2016
RO30.03.2016
RS30.03.2016
SE30.03.2016
SI30.03.2016
SK30.03.2016
SM30.03.2016
TR30.03.2016
IE05.04.2016
LU05.04.2016
CH30.04.2016
LI30.04.2016
MT30.04.2016
NO30.06.2016
GR01.07.2016
IS30.07.2016
PT01.08.2016
[2018/46]
Former [2018/45]HU05.04.2013
AT30.03.2016
BE30.03.2016
BG30.03.2016
CY30.03.2016
CZ30.03.2016
DK30.03.2016
EE30.03.2016
ES30.03.2016
FI30.03.2016
HR30.03.2016
IT30.03.2016
LT30.03.2016
LV30.03.2016
MC30.03.2016
MK30.03.2016
PL30.03.2016
RO30.03.2016
RS30.03.2016
SE30.03.2016
SI30.03.2016
SK30.03.2016
SM30.03.2016
TR30.03.2016
IE05.04.2016
LU05.04.2016
CH30.04.2016
LI30.04.2016
MT30.04.2016
NO30.06.2016
GR01.07.2016
IS30.07.2016
PT01.08.2016
Former [2018/38]HU05.04.2013
AT30.03.2016
BE30.03.2016
BG30.03.2016
CY30.03.2016
CZ30.03.2016
DK30.03.2016
EE30.03.2016
ES30.03.2016
FI30.03.2016
HR30.03.2016
IT30.03.2016
LT30.03.2016
LV30.03.2016
MC30.03.2016
MK30.03.2016
PL30.03.2016
RO30.03.2016
RS30.03.2016
SE30.03.2016
SI30.03.2016
SK30.03.2016
SM30.03.2016
IE05.04.2016
LU05.04.2016
CH30.04.2016
LI30.04.2016
MT30.04.2016
NO30.06.2016
GR01.07.2016
IS30.07.2016
PT01.08.2016
Former [2018/32]HU05.04.2013
AT30.03.2016
BE30.03.2016
CY30.03.2016
CZ30.03.2016
DK30.03.2016
EE30.03.2016
ES30.03.2016
FI30.03.2016
HR30.03.2016
IT30.03.2016
LT30.03.2016
LV30.03.2016
MC30.03.2016
MK30.03.2016
PL30.03.2016
RO30.03.2016
RS30.03.2016
SE30.03.2016
SI30.03.2016
SK30.03.2016
SM30.03.2016
IE05.04.2016
LU05.04.2016
CH30.04.2016
LI30.04.2016
MT30.04.2016
NO30.06.2016
GR01.07.2016
IS30.07.2016
PT01.08.2016
Former [2018/30]HU05.04.2013
AT30.03.2016
BE30.03.2016
CY30.03.2016
CZ30.03.2016
DK30.03.2016
EE30.03.2016
ES30.03.2016
FI30.03.2016
HR30.03.2016
IT30.03.2016
LT30.03.2016
LV30.03.2016
MC30.03.2016
MK30.03.2016
PL30.03.2016
RO30.03.2016
RS30.03.2016
SE30.03.2016
SI30.03.2016
SK30.03.2016
SM30.03.2016
IE05.04.2016
LU05.04.2016
CH30.04.2016
LI30.04.2016
NO30.06.2016
GR01.07.2016
IS30.07.2016
PT01.08.2016
Former [2017/37]AT30.03.2016
BE30.03.2016
CZ30.03.2016
DK30.03.2016
EE30.03.2016
ES30.03.2016
FI30.03.2016
HR30.03.2016
IT30.03.2016
LT30.03.2016
LV30.03.2016
PL30.03.2016
RO30.03.2016
RS30.03.2016
SE30.03.2016
SI30.03.2016
SK30.03.2016
SM30.03.2016
IE05.04.2016
CH30.04.2016
LI30.04.2016
NO30.06.2016
GR01.07.2016
IS30.07.2016
PT01.08.2016
Former [2017/07]AT30.03.2016
BE30.03.2016
CZ30.03.2016
DK30.03.2016
EE30.03.2016
ES30.03.2016
FI30.03.2016
HR30.03.2016
IT30.03.2016
LT30.03.2016
LV30.03.2016
PL30.03.2016
RO30.03.2016
RS30.03.2016
SE30.03.2016
SK30.03.2016
SM30.03.2016
CH30.04.2016
LI30.04.2016
NO30.06.2016
GR01.07.2016
IS30.07.2016
PT01.08.2016
Former [2017/03]AT30.03.2016
BE30.03.2016
CZ30.03.2016
EE30.03.2016
ES30.03.2016
FI30.03.2016
HR30.03.2016
IT30.03.2016
LT30.03.2016
LV30.03.2016
PL30.03.2016
RO30.03.2016
RS30.03.2016
SE30.03.2016
SK30.03.2016
SM30.03.2016
NO30.06.2016
GR01.07.2016
IS30.07.2016
PT01.08.2016
Former [2016/51]AT30.03.2016
CZ30.03.2016
EE30.03.2016
ES30.03.2016
FI30.03.2016
HR30.03.2016
LT30.03.2016
LV30.03.2016
PL30.03.2016
RO30.03.2016
RS30.03.2016
SE30.03.2016
SK30.03.2016
SM30.03.2016
BE30.04.2016
NO30.06.2016
GR01.07.2016
IS30.07.2016
PT01.08.2016
Former [2016/50]AT30.03.2016
CZ30.03.2016
EE30.03.2016
ES30.03.2016
FI30.03.2016
HR30.03.2016
LT30.03.2016
LV30.03.2016
PL30.03.2016
RO30.03.2016
RS30.03.2016
SE30.03.2016
SK30.03.2016
SM30.03.2016
BE30.04.2016
NO30.06.2016
GR01.07.2016
IS30.07.2016
Former [2016/49]EE30.03.2016
FI30.03.2016
HR30.03.2016
LT30.03.2016
LV30.03.2016
PL30.03.2016
RS30.03.2016
SE30.03.2016
BE30.04.2016
NO30.06.2016
GR01.07.2016
IS30.07.2016
Former [2016/48]FI30.03.2016
HR30.03.2016
LT30.03.2016
LV30.03.2016
RS30.03.2016
SE30.03.2016
BE30.04.2016
NO30.06.2016
GR01.07.2016
IS30.07.2016
Former [2016/39]FI30.03.2016
HR30.03.2016
LT30.03.2016
LV30.03.2016
RS30.03.2016
SE30.03.2016
BE30.04.2016
NO30.06.2016
GR01.07.2016
Former [2016/36]FI30.03.2016
HR30.03.2016
LT30.03.2016
BE30.04.2016
NO30.06.2016
GR01.07.2016
Former [2016/35]FI30.03.2016
HR30.03.2016
NO30.06.2016
GR01.07.2016
Documents cited:Search[Y]US2010167783  (ALAMEH RACHID M [US] ET AL) [Y] 1-13 * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0017] * * paragraph [0025]; figures 1,2 * * paragraph [0029]; figure 3 * * paragraph [0034]; figure 4A *;
 [Y]US8170621  (LOCKWOOD MIKE [US]) [Y] 1-13 * column 2, line 21 - column 3, line 5 * * column 3, line 55 - column 5, line 15; figure 1 *;
 [Y]US2012147531  (RABII KHOSRO M [US]) [Y] 9 * paragraph [0048] - paragraph [0052]; figure 6 *;
 [A]US2010321321  (SHENFIELD ALON [CA] ET AL) [A] 1-13 * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0031]; figure 1 * * paragraph [0038] - paragraph [0040]; figure 6 *