Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2787715 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2787715



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 216
03.02.2017 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
31.03.2016 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
03.03.2016 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
05.02.2016 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
05.02.2016 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
05.02.2016 French translation of claims Search / examination 3
05.02.2016 French translation of claims Search / examination 3
05.02.2016 German translation of the claims Search / examination 4
05.02.2016 German translation of the claims Search / examination 4
05.02.2016 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
05.02.2016 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
05.02.2016 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
03.11.2015 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
08.10.2015 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
08.10.2015 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
08.10.2015 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
08.10.2015 Text intended for grant Search / examination 40
08.10.2015 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 40
31.08.2015 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
28.08.2015 Examination started Search / examination 1
18.08.2015 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
11.03.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
11.03.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
11.03.2015 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
11.03.2015 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
11.03.2015 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
11.03.2015 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
11.03.2015 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
11.03.2015 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 3
11.03.2015 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 3
11.03.2015 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 3
11.03.2015 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 4
11.03.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
11.03.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
13.10.2014 Invitation to confirm maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 2
10.09.2014 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
24.10.2013 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
17.10.2013 Request for change of address - applicant Search / examination 1
12.09.2013 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
12.09.2013 European search opinion Search / examination 4
12.09.2013 European search report Search / examination 2
06.09.2013 Modified abstract Search / examination 1
02.09.2013 Search started Search / examination 1
06.08.2013 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
19.07.2013 Request for change of name - applicant Search / examination 4
05.04.2013 Abstract Search / examination 1
05.04.2013 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
05.04.2013 Claims Search / examination 3
05.04.2013 Description Search / examination 32
05.04.2013 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
05.04.2013 Drawings Search / examination 4
05.04.2013 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 4