Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2787715


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
12.10.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  14.11.2018  [2018/46]
05.10.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  07.11.2018  [2018/45]
17.08.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  19.09.2018  [2018/38]
20.07.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  22.08.2018  [2018/34]
06.07.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  08.08.2018  [2018/32]
22.06.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  25.07.2018  [2018/30]
18.08.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.09.2017  [2017/38]
11.08.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  13.09.2017  [2017/37]
03.02.2017 No opposition filed within time limit published on  08.03.2017  [2017/10]
13.01.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  15.02.2017  [2017/07]
23.12.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  25.01.2017  [2017/04]
16.12.2016 Change - lapse in a contracting state published on  18.01.2017  [2017/03]
25.11.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  28.12.2016  [2016/52]
18.11.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  21.12.2016  [2016/51]
11.11.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  14.12.2016  [2016/50]
04.11.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  07.12.2016  [2016/49]
28.10.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  30.11.2016  [2016/48]
26.08.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  28.09.2016  [2016/39]
12.08.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  14.09.2016  [2016/37]
05.08.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  07.09.2016  [2016/36]
29.07.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  31.08.2016  [2016/35]
26.02.2016 (Expected) grant published on  30.03.2016  [2016/13]
12.02.2016 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
09.02.2016 New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
07.10.2015 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
04.09.2015 Change - classification published on  07.10.2015  [2015/41]
04.09.2015 Change - classification published on  07.10.2015  [2015/41]
26.08.2015 Change - representative
30.04.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
13.03.2015 Amendment by applicant
07.10.2014 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  08.10.2014  [2014/41]
05.09.2014 Request for examination filed published on  08.10.2014  [2014/41]