Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2786960

EP2786960 - Constant flow rate throttle for a beer dispenser [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  13.03.2015
Database last updated on 19.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip13.03.2015Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 15.04.2015  [2015/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Carlsberg Breweries A/S
Ny Carlsberg Vej 100
1799 Copenhagen V / DK
[2014/41]
Inventor(s)01 / Rasmussen, Jan No̸rager
Rytterbakken 22
3650 O̸lstykke / DK
02 / Vesborg, Steen
Dronningemarken 4
2820 Gentofte / DK
03 / Christiansen, Jonas
Skjoldborg alle 17
2860 So̸borg / DK
 [2014/41]
Representative(s)Budde Schou A/S
Hausergade 3
1128 Copenhagen K / DK
[2014/41]
Application number, filing date13162501.405.04.2013
[2014/41]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2786960
Date:08.10.2014
Language:EN
[2014/41]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.09.2013
ClassificationInternational:B67D1/12, B67D1/14, F16K15/06, G05D16/18
[2014/41]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/41]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Drossel für konstanten Durchfluss von Bier[2014/41]
English:Constant flow rate throttle for a beer dispenser[2014/41]
French:Piège provoquant un flux constant de la bière[2014/41]
Examination procedure05.04.2013Examination requested  [2014/41]
05.03.2015Application withdrawn by applicant  [2015/16]
Documents cited:Search[X]EP2371759  (ANHEUSER BUSCH INBEV S A [BE]) [X] 1,15 * paragraphs [0003] , [00 6] , [0027] - [0029]; figure - *;
 [X]GB2348185  (IMI CORNELIUS [GB]) [X] 1,2,15 * page 1, lines 17-24 * * page 4, line 20 - page 5, line 27; figures 1, 3 *;
 [A]KR20090070553  (NOVITA CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1,15 * abstract *;
 [A]WO2010070531  (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL]; VAN DER KOOI JOHANNES T [NL]; DUI) [A] 1,15 * page 2, line 23 - page 3, line 5; figures 2-6 *;
 [A]EP2336077  (ANHEUSER BUSCH INBEV S A [BE]) [A] 1,15 * paragraphs [0003] , [0017] , [0018] , [0021]; figures 2-4 *;
 [A]DE19802291  (MOGLER GMBH & CO GEB [DE]) [A] 1,15 * column 1, lines 23-50; figure - *
by applicantWO2007019848
 WO2007019849
 WO2007019850
 WO2007019851
 WO2007019853
 WO2011157786
 EP1737759
 EP1170247
 EP1648813