Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2787320

EP2787320 - Total station with scan functionality and selectable scan modi [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  27.07.2018
Database last updated on 21.10.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  18.08.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  31.05.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip11.10.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AT
published on 13.11.2019 [2019/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Leica Geosystems AG
Heinrich-Wild-Strasse
9435 Heerbrugg / CH
[2014/41]
Inventor(s)01 / Zogg, Hans-Martin
Kesswilerstrasse 13
8592 Uttwil / CH
02 / Lengweiler, Patrik
Stuzt 6
7304 Maienfeld / CH
03 / Natau, Robert
Nestweiherstrasse 31
9012 St. Gallen / CH
04 / Stuzt, Reto
Neudorfstrasse 1
9442 Berneck / CH
 [2015/08]
Former [2014/41]01 / Zogg, Hans-Martin
Kesswilerstrasse 13
8592 Uttwil / CH
02 / Lengweiler, Patrik
Stuzt 6
7304 Maienfeld / CH
03 / Natau, Robert
Nestweiherstrasse 31
9012 St. Gallen / CH
04 / Stuzt, Reto
Gässeli 2
9442 Berneck / CH
Representative(s)Kaminski Harmann
Patentanwälte AG
Landstrasse 124
9490 Vaduz / LI
[N/P]
Former [2014/41]Allwardt, Anke
Kaminski Harmann
Patentanwälte AG
Landstrasse 124
9490 Vaduz / LI
Application number, filing date13162569.105.04.2013
[2014/41]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2787320
Date:08.10.2014
Language:DE
[2014/41]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2787320
Date:20.09.2017
Language:DE
[2017/38]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.09.2013
ClassificationInternational:G01C15/00, G01B11/14
[2017/18]
Former International [2014/41]G01C15/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/38]
Former [2014/41]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:Totalstation mit Scanfunktionalität und wählbaren Scanmodi[2014/41]
English:Total station with scan functionality and selectable scan modi[2014/41]
French:Station totale avec fonctionnalité de balayage et modes de balayage sélectionnables[2014/41]
Examination procedure26.11.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
26.11.2014Examination requested  [2015/02]
01.06.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.08.2017Fee for grant paid
10.08.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
10.08.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  01.06.2017
Opposition(s)21.06.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/35]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.04.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
29.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
21.04.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCZ20.09.2017
DK20.09.2017
EE20.09.2017
ES20.09.2017
FI20.09.2017
HR20.09.2017
IT20.09.2017
LT20.09.2017
LV20.09.2017
MC20.09.2017
MT20.09.2017
PL20.09.2017
RO20.09.2017
RS20.09.2017
SI20.09.2017
SK20.09.2017
SM20.09.2017
BG20.12.2017
NO20.12.2017
GR21.12.2017
IS20.01.2018
AT05.04.2018
IE05.04.2018
LU05.04.2018
BE30.04.2018
[2019/46]
Former [2019/19]CZ20.09.2017
DK20.09.2017
EE20.09.2017
ES20.09.2017
FI20.09.2017
HR20.09.2017
IT20.09.2017
LT20.09.2017
LV20.09.2017
MC20.09.2017
MT20.09.2017
PL20.09.2017
RO20.09.2017
RS20.09.2017
SI20.09.2017
SK20.09.2017
SM20.09.2017
BG20.12.2017
NO20.12.2017
GR21.12.2017
IS20.01.2018
IE05.04.2018
LU05.04.2018
BE30.04.2018
Former [2019/12]CZ20.09.2017
DK20.09.2017
EE20.09.2017
ES20.09.2017
FI20.09.2017
HR20.09.2017
IT20.09.2017
LT20.09.2017
LV20.09.2017
MC20.09.2017
MT20.09.2017
PL20.09.2017
RO20.09.2017
RS20.09.2017
SI20.09.2017
SK20.09.2017
SM20.09.2017
BG20.12.2017
NO20.12.2017
GR21.12.2017
IS20.01.2018
LU05.04.2018
BE30.04.2018
Former [2019/08]CZ20.09.2017
DK20.09.2017
EE20.09.2017
ES20.09.2017
FI20.09.2017
HR20.09.2017
IT20.09.2017
LT20.09.2017
LV20.09.2017
MC20.09.2017
MT20.09.2017
PL20.09.2017
RO20.09.2017
RS20.09.2017
SI20.09.2017
SK20.09.2017
SM20.09.2017
BG20.12.2017
NO20.12.2017
GR21.12.2017
IS20.01.2018
LU05.04.2018
Former [2018/52]CZ20.09.2017
DK20.09.2017
EE20.09.2017
ES20.09.2017
FI20.09.2017
HR20.09.2017
IT20.09.2017
LT20.09.2017
LV20.09.2017
MC20.09.2017
MT20.09.2017
PL20.09.2017
RO20.09.2017
RS20.09.2017
SI20.09.2017
SK20.09.2017
SM20.09.2017
BG20.12.2017
NO20.12.2017
GR21.12.2017
IS20.01.2018
Former [2018/43]CZ20.09.2017
DK20.09.2017
EE20.09.2017
ES20.09.2017
FI20.09.2017
HR20.09.2017
IT20.09.2017
LT20.09.2017
LV20.09.2017
MT20.09.2017
PL20.09.2017
RO20.09.2017
RS20.09.2017
SK20.09.2017
SM20.09.2017
BG20.12.2017
NO20.12.2017
GR21.12.2017
IS20.01.2018
Former [2018/35]CZ20.09.2017
DK20.09.2017
EE20.09.2017
ES20.09.2017
FI20.09.2017
HR20.09.2017
IT20.09.2017
LT20.09.2017
LV20.09.2017
PL20.09.2017
RO20.09.2017
RS20.09.2017
SK20.09.2017
SM20.09.2017
BG20.12.2017
NO20.12.2017
GR21.12.2017
IS20.01.2018
Former [2018/24]CZ20.09.2017
EE20.09.2017
ES20.09.2017
FI20.09.2017
HR20.09.2017
IT20.09.2017
LT20.09.2017
LV20.09.2017
PL20.09.2017
RO20.09.2017
RS20.09.2017
SK20.09.2017
SM20.09.2017
BG20.12.2017
NO20.12.2017
GR21.12.2017
IS20.01.2018
Former [2018/21]CZ20.09.2017
FI20.09.2017
HR20.09.2017
LT20.09.2017
LV20.09.2017
RS20.09.2017
BG20.12.2017
NO20.12.2017
GR21.12.2017
Former [2018/12]FI20.09.2017
HR20.09.2017
LT20.09.2017
LV20.09.2017
RS20.09.2017
BG20.12.2017
NO20.12.2017
GR21.12.2017
Former [2018/11]FI20.09.2017
HR20.09.2017
LT20.09.2017
RS20.09.2017
BG20.12.2017
NO20.12.2017
GR21.12.2017
Former [2018/08]FI20.09.2017
LT20.09.2017
NO20.12.2017
Former [2018/07]LT20.09.2017
NO20.12.2017
Documents cited:Search[Y]EP1342989  (RIEGL LASER MEASUREMENT SYS [AT]) [Y] 1-14 * paragraphs [0023] - [0031]; figure 2 *;
 [Y]  - C.HUG, A.ULLRICH, A.GRIMM, "Litemapper-5600 - a waveform-digitizing Lidar Terrain and Vegetation Mapping System", INTERNATIONAL ARCHIVES OF PHOTOGRAMMETRY, REMOTE SENSING AND SPATIAL INFORMATION SCIENCES, (20041003), vol. XXXVI, pages 24 - 29, XP002712325 [Y] 1-14 * the whole document *
ExaminationUS2012224164
 US2002065620
    - MICHAEL SCHERER ET AL, "From the Conventional Total Station to the Prospective Image Assisted Photogrammetric Scanning Total Station: Comprehensive Review", vol. 135, no. 4, doi:10.1061/(ASCE)0733-9453(2009)135:4(173), ISSN 0733-9453, (20090101), pages 173 - 178, JOURNAL OF SURVEYING ENGINEERING, AMERICAN SOCIETY OF CIVIL ENGINEERS, RESTON, VA, US, URL: http://ascelibrary.org/doi/abs/10.1061/%28ASCE%290733-9453%282009%29135:4%28173%29, (20091015), XP008182022

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1061/(ASCE)0733-9453(2009)135:4(173)
by applicantUS2010070229