Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2787503 RSS: dossier

Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 55
09.09.2015 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
02.09.2015 Final instructions (application deemed to be withdrawn/application refused) Search / examination 1
03.06.2015 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 2
18.05.2015 Application deemed to be withdrawn (no declaration of maintenance of the application/non-reply to the Written Opinion) Search / examination 2
13.10.2014 Invitation to confirm maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 2
10.09.2014 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
21.06.2013 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
21.06.2013 European search opinion Search / examination 5
21.06.2013 European search report Search / examination 2
05.04.2013 Abstract Search / examination 1
05.04.2013 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
05.04.2013 Claims Search / examination 3
05.04.2013 Description Search / examination 18
05.04.2013 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
05.04.2013 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
05.04.2013 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
05.04.2013 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
05.04.2013 Drawings Search / examination 4
05.04.2013 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 5