Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2787503


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
04.09.2015 Application deemed to be withdrawn published on  07.10.2015  [2015/41]
04.06.2015 New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit
18.05.2015 New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit
07.10.2014 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  08.10.2014  [2014/41]
05.09.2014 Request for examination filed published on  08.10.2014  [2014/41]