Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2787503

EP2787503 - Method and system of audio signal watermarking [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  04.09.2015
Database last updated on 17.11.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip04.09.2015Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 07.10.2015  [2015/41]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Movym S.r.l.
Via Carlo De Cristoforis, 13
20124 Milano / IT
[2014/41]
Inventor(s)01 / Abrardo, Andrea
Via Redi 14
I-50018 Scandicci (FI) / IT
02 / Barni, Mauro
Via Boni 108
I-59100 Prato / IT
03 / Ferrari, Gianluigi
Via Signorelli 16
I-43124 Parma / IT
04 / Arconte, Davide
c/o Movym S.r.l.
Via Carlo de Cristoforis 13
I-20124 Milano / IT
 [2014/41]
Representative(s)Giannesi, Simona
Porta, Checcacci & Associati S.p.A.
Via Trebbia, 20
20135 Milano / IT
[2014/41]
Application number, filing date13162596.405.04.2013
[2014/41]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2787503
Date:08.10.2014
Language:EN
[2014/41]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP21.06.2013
ClassificationInternational:G10L19/018
[2014/41]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/41]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Verfahren und System zur Audiosignal-Wasserzeichenmarkierung[2014/41]
English:Method and system of audio signal watermarking[2014/41]
French:Procédé et système de tatouage de signaux audio[2014/41]
Examination procedure05.04.2013Examination requested  [2014/41]
09.04.2015Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2015/41]
18.05.2015Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2015/41]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.04.201503   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XAYI]US7127065  (DEPOVERE GEERT FLORIMOND GERAR [NL], et al) [X] 1,3,8-10,13,15 * column 1, line 7 - line 11 * * column 1, line 53 - column 2, line 17; claims 1,3 * * column 4, line 54 - column 5, line 7; claims 4,6 * [A] 4-7 [Y] 12 [I] 2,11,14;
 [XAYI]US2004059918  (XU CHANGSHENG [SG]) [X] 1,8,13,14 * paragraph [0008]; claim 1 * * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0031]; figure 2 * * paragraph [0042] - paragraph [0043] * [A] 9-12,15 [Y] 7 [I] 2-6;
 [XAYI]US6674861  (XU CHANGSHENG [SG], et al) [X] 1,8,13,14 * column 1, line 66 - column 3, line 13 * * column 4, line 65 - column 6, line 10 * * column 7, line 4 - line 32 * * column 9, line 32 - column 10, line 53; figure 1 * * column 11, line 50 - column 14, line 67 * [A] 9-12,15 [Y] 7 [I] 2-6;
 [YA]US2010057231  (SLATER CHRISTOPHER [GB], et al) [Y] 7 * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0042] - paragraph [0044] * [A] 1-6,8-15;
 [YA]US6456726  (YU HONG HEATHER [US], et al) [Y] 12 * column 1, line 6 - line 8 * * column 1, line 53 - line 62 * * column 2, line 10 - line 27; figure 1 * * column 2, line 61 - column 3, line 23 * * column 4, line 6 - line 43; figure 2 * [A] 1-11,13-15
by applicantEP1594122