Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2653367

EP2653367 - Parking aid device, parking aid method, program, and storage medium storing the program [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  29.07.2016
Database last updated on 21.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip29.07.2016Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 31.08.2016  [2016/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha
1 Toyota-cho
Toyota-shi, Aichi 471-8571 / JP
[2013/43]
Inventor(s)01 / Ishijima, Hironobu
c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA
1, Toyota-cho
Toyota-shi, Aichi 471-8571 / JP
02 / Satonaka, Hisashi
c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA
1, Toyota-cho
Toyota-shi, Aichi 471-8571 / JP
03 / Yoshikawa, Tatsuya
c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA
1, Toyota-cho
Toyota-shi, Aichi 471-8571 / JP
04 / Hata, Keisuke
c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA
1, Toyota-cho
Toyota-shi, Aichi 471-8571 / JP
 [2013/43]
Representative(s)Winter, Brandl, Fürniss, Hübner, Röss, Kaiser, Polte - Partnerschaft mbB
Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei
Alois-Steinecker-Strasse 22
85354 Freising / DE
[N/P]
Former [2013/43]Winter, Brandl, Fürniss, Hübner, Röss, Kaiser, Polte - Partnerschaft
Bavariaring 10
80336 München / DE
Application number, filing date13162686.308.04.2013
[2013/43]
Priority number, dateJP2012009554919.04.2012         Original published format: JP 2012095549
[2013/43]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2653367
Date:23.10.2013
Language:EN
[2013/43]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2653367
Date:02.07.2014
Language:EN
[2014/27]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.06.2014
ClassificationInternational:B62D15/02, B60Q9/00, G08G1/14, G08G1/16, G01S17/42, G01S17/87, G01S17/93, G01S7/48, G06K9/00, G06K9/46
[2014/27]
Former International [2013/43]B62D15/02
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2013/43]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Parkhilfevorrichtung, Parkhilfeverfahren, Programm und Speichermedium, das das Programm speichert[2013/43]
English:Parking aid device, parking aid method, program, and storage medium storing the program[2013/43]
French:Dispositif et procédé d'aide au stationnement, programme et support de stockage stockant le programme[2013/43]
Examination proceduredeletedCommunication of intention to grant the patent
08.04.2013Examination requested  [2013/43]
30.12.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
15.05.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.09.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.11.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.03.2016Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2016/35]
22.04.2016Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2016/35]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  15.05.2015
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.04.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
30.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[X]DE102008048490  (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [X] 1-9 * paragraphs [0001] , [0009] , [0027] , [0032] , [0034] , [0035]; figure -; claim - *;
 [XA]US2011057814  (PARK SEUNG BUM [KR]) [X] 1,7-9 * paragraphs [0009] , [0030] , [0033] , [0043] , [0044] , [0 47] , [0 60]; figure -; claim - * [A] 2-6;
 [XA]JP2007139665  (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [X] 1,7-9 * paragraphs [0032] , [0033] , [0 39] - [0042]; figure -; claim - * [A] 2-6;
 [A]EP2234085  (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-9 * paragraphs [0023] , [0 27] , [0 28]; figure -; claim - *;
 [A]US2011087406  (BARTH HARALD [DE], et al) [A] 1-9 * paragraphs [0039] - [0040]; figure -; claim - *;
 [A]US7205905  (GOTZIG HEINRICH [DE], et al) [A] 1-9 * abstract *
by applicantJP2010195118
 JP2007210612