Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2790341

EP2790341 - Method for multiplexing and/or demultiplexing and optical network element [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  04.11.2016
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip04.09.2019New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Deutsche Telekom AG
Friedrich-Ebert-Allee 140
53113 Bonn / DE
[2014/42]
Inventor(s)01 / Gunkel, Matthias
Tulpenweg 29
64291 Darmstadt / DE
02 / Leppla, Ralph
Am Mühlgraben 15
64404 Bickenbach / DE
03 / Weiershausen, Werner
Nieder-Röder-Str. 48c
64859 Eppertshausen / DE
04 / Würtenberger, Werner
Bismarckstr. 16
64853 Otzberg / DE
 [2014/42]
Representative(s)Blumbach · Zinngrebe Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Alexandrastraße 5
65187 Wiesbaden / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/42]Blumbach Zinngrebe
Patentanwälte
Alexandrastrasse 5
65187 Wiesbaden / DE
Application number, filing date13162751.508.04.2013
[2014/42]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2790341
Date:15.10.2014
Language:DE
[2014/42]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.09.2013
ClassificationInternational:H04J14/02
[2014/42]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/42]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Verfahren zum Multiplexen und/oder Demultiplexen und optisches Netzelement[2014/42]
English:Method for multiplexing and/or demultiplexing and optical network element[2014/42]
French:Procédé de multiplexage et/ou démultiplexage et élément de réseau optique[2014/42]
Examination procedure03.03.2015Examination requested  [2015/16]
15.04.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
26.10.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
05.05.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.10.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.02.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.01.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.05.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.09.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  26.10.2016
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.04.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
30.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
28.04.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
26.04.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
30.04.2019Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[XI]WO2004109958  (NORTEL NETWORKS LTD [CA]) [X] 1,2,4,5,10,11,13,15 * abstract * * page 5, line 6 - page 6, line 9 * [I] 3,6-9,12,14;
 [XI]US2010129076  (BARBAROSSA GIOVANNI [US]) [X] 1,2,4,5,10,11,13,15 * abstract * * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0044] * [I] 3,6-9,12,14;
 [A]US2013045006  (DAHAN DAVID JIMMY [IL], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0050] * * paragraph [0070] - paragraph [0108] *;
 [A]EP1324523  (FUJITSU LTD [JP]) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0070] - paragraph [0072] * * paragraph [0090] - paragraph [0092] *