Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2790093 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2790093



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 125
07.12.2018 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 7
07.12.2018 Claims Search / examination 7
07.12.2018 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
26.11.2018 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 2
20.11.2018 Request for change of address - applicant Search / examination 2
04.06.2018 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
04.06.2018 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
28.05.2018 Examination started Search / examination 1
26.02.2018 Notification regarding date of start of examination with possibility to withdraw Search / examination 1
17.03.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
17.03.2015 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 6
17.03.2015 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 6
17.03.2015 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
17.03.2015 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 2
17.03.2015 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 8
17.03.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
20.10.2014 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
17.09.2014 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
30.01.2014 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the applicant (Association) Search / examination 1
22.11.2013 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
18.09.2013 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
18.09.2013 European search opinion Search / examination 4
18.09.2013 European search report Search / examination 2
02.09.2013 Search started Search / examination 1
07.06.2013 Drawings Search / examination 5
07.06.2013 Reply to the invitation to remedy deficiencies Search / examination 1
14.05.2013 Deficiencies in application documents - annex C Search / examination 3
09.04.2013 Abstract Search / examination 1
09.04.2013 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
09.04.2013 Claims Search / examination 6
09.04.2013 Description Search / examination 26
09.04.2013 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
09.04.2013 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
09.04.2013 Drawings Search / examination 5
09.04.2013 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 5