Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2790093 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

CN201480020542 EP13162964



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9791935Global Dossier 17.10.2017B2
US2016070358 10.03.2016A1
Priority number Date
EP13162964 09.04.2013
WO2014EP56839 04.04.2014
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN105103085BGlobal Dossier 21.09.2018B
CN105103085 25.11.2015A
Priority number Date
EP13162964 09.04.2013
WO2014EP56839 04.04.2014
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2014166844Global Dossier 16.10.2014A1
Priority number Date
EP13162964 09.04.2013
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP2790093Global Dossier 15.10.2014A1
Priority number Date
EP13162964 09.04.2013