Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2790093

EP2790093 - Method for gesture detection, optical sensor circuit, in particular an optical sensor circuit for gesture detection, and optical sensor arrangement for gesture detection [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  01.06.2018
Database last updated on 20.11.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip01.05.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ams AG
Schloss Premstätten
Tobelbader Str. 30
8141 Premstätten / AT
[2018/52]
Former [2014/42]For all designated states
ams AG
Schloss Premstätten
Tobelbader Strasse 30
8141 Unterpremstätten / AT
Inventor(s)01 / Trattler, Peter
Josef-Lanner-Str. 28
8055 Graz / AT
02 / Manninger, Mario
Schwarzer Weg 92
8141 Unterpremstätten / AT
 [2014/42]
Representative(s)Epping - Hermann - Fischer
Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH
Schloßschmidstraße 5
80639 München / DE
[2014/42]
Application number, filing date13162964.409.04.2013
[2014/42]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2790093
Date:15.10.2014
Language:EN
[2014/42]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.09.2013
ClassificationInternational:G06F3/042
[2014/42]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/17]
Former [2014/42]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Gestenerkennung, optische Sensorschaltung, insbesondere eine optische Sensorschaltung zur Gestenerkennung und optische Sensoranordnung zur Gestenerkennung[2014/42]
English:Method for gesture detection, optical sensor circuit, in particular an optical sensor circuit for gesture detection, and optical sensor arrangement for gesture detection[2014/42]
French:Procédé pour détection de geste, circuit à capteur optique, en particulier un circuit de capteur optique pour une détection de geste et dispositif de capteur optique pour la détection de geste[2014/42]
Examination procedure17.03.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
17.03.2015Examination requested  [2015/17]
04.06.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
07.12.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  04.06.2018
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.04.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
20.04.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
21.04.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
23.04.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
24.04.2019Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[X]US2012050258  (KAY ANDREW [GB] ET AL) [X] 1-18 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0029] *;
 [X]US2010299642  (MERRELL THOMAS [US] ET AL) [X] 1-18 * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0006] * * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0032] * * paragraph [0048] - paragraph [0053] * * paragraph [0109] - paragraph [0133]; figures 19-27 *;
 [X]US2012133624  (CASTAGNER JEAN LUC LAURENT [GB] ET AL) [X] 1-18 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0030] *;
 [A]US2010167783  (ALAMEH RACHID M [US] ET AL) [A] 1-18 * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0004] *;
 [A]US2005226505  (WILSON ANDREW D [US]) [A] 1-18 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0014] *