Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2790101

EP2790101 - System and method for automated virtual commissioning of an industrial automation system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  16.01.2018
Database last updated on 19.08.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip22.02.2019New entry: Date of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ABB Schweiz AG
Brown Boveri Strasse 6
5400 Baden / CH
[2016/44]
Former [2014/42]For all designated states
ABB Technology AG
Affolternstrasse 44
8050 Zürich / CH
Inventor(s)01 / Hoernicke, Mario
Rupprechtstr. 13
76829 Landau / DE
02 / Barth, Mike
Hardweg 3
76275 Ettlingen / DE
03 / Royston, Steve
22 Playfield Close
Biggleswade
Bedfordshire SG18 8JL / GB
 [2014/42]
Representative(s)Kesselhut, Wolf , et al
Reble & Klose Rechts- und Patentanwälte Konrad-Zuse-Ring 32
68163 Mannheim / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/42]Kock, Ina
ABB AG
GF-IP
Wallstadter Straße 59
68526 Ladenburg / DE
Application number, filing date13163147.510.04.2013
[2014/42]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2790101
Date:15.10.2014
Language:EN
[2014/42]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2790101
Date:20.01.2016
Language:EN
[2016/03]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.09.2013
ClassificationInternational:G06F9/455, G05B19/418
[2014/42]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/42]
TitleGerman:System und Verfahren zur automatischen virtuellen Inbetriebnahme eines industriellen Automatisierungssystems[2014/42]
English:System and method for automated virtual commissioning of an industrial automation system[2014/42]
French:Système et procédé de mise en service automatisée virtuelle d'un système d'automatisation industrielle[2014/42]
Examination procedure09.03.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
09.03.2015Examination requested  [2015/17]
29.04.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.08.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.10.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.11.2015Fee for grant paid
17.11.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
17.11.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  29.04.2015
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  20.10.2016  25.10.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Siemens Aktiengesellschaft
Werner-von-Siemens-Straße 1
80333 München / DE
 [2017/50]
Former [2016/48]
Opponent(s)01  20.10.2016  25.10.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Siemens Aktiengesellschaft
Wittelsbacherplatz 2
80333 München / DE
deletedDeletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ]
24.11.2016Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
21.03.2017Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
19.12.2017Date of oral proceedings
17.01.2018Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
17.01.2018Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
20.11.2019Date of oral proceedings
Appeal following opposition05.03.2018Appeal received No.  T0623/18
28.05.2018Statement of grounds filed
13.11.2018Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M02) [2018/46]
29.11.2018Date of receipt of observations in an appeal [2018/48]
07.01.2019Result of appeal procedure: continuation of opposition procedure
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.04.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU10.04.2013
AL20.01.2016
AT20.01.2016
BE20.01.2016
CY20.01.2016
CZ20.01.2016
DK20.01.2016
EE20.01.2016
ES20.01.2016
FI20.01.2016
HR20.01.2016
IT20.01.2016
LT20.01.2016
LV20.01.2016
MC20.01.2016
MK20.01.2016
NL20.01.2016
PL20.01.2016
RO20.01.2016
RS20.01.2016
SE20.01.2016
SI20.01.2016
SK20.01.2016
SM20.01.2016
TR20.01.2016
IE10.04.2016
LU10.04.2016
BG20.04.2016
NO20.04.2016
GR21.04.2016
CH30.04.2016
LI30.04.2016
MT30.04.2016
FR02.05.2016
IS20.05.2016
PT20.05.2016
[2018/46]
Former [2018/45]HU10.04.2013
AT20.01.2016
BE20.01.2016
CY20.01.2016
CZ20.01.2016
DK20.01.2016
EE20.01.2016
ES20.01.2016
FI20.01.2016
HR20.01.2016
IT20.01.2016
LT20.01.2016
LV20.01.2016
MC20.01.2016
MK20.01.2016
NL20.01.2016
PL20.01.2016
RO20.01.2016
RS20.01.2016
SE20.01.2016
SI20.01.2016
SK20.01.2016
SM20.01.2016
TR20.01.2016
IE10.04.2016
LU10.04.2016
BG20.04.2016
NO20.04.2016
GR21.04.2016
CH30.04.2016
LI30.04.2016
MT30.04.2016
FR02.05.2016
IS20.05.2016
PT20.05.2016
Former [2018/32]HU10.04.2013
AT20.01.2016
BE20.01.2016
CY20.01.2016
CZ20.01.2016
DK20.01.2016
EE20.01.2016
ES20.01.2016
FI20.01.2016
HR20.01.2016
IT20.01.2016
LT20.01.2016
LV20.01.2016
MC20.01.2016
MK20.01.2016
NL20.01.2016
PL20.01.2016
RO20.01.2016
RS20.01.2016
SE20.01.2016
SI20.01.2016
SK20.01.2016
SM20.01.2016
IE10.04.2016
LU10.04.2016
BG20.04.2016
NO20.04.2016
GR21.04.2016
CH30.04.2016
LI30.04.2016
MT30.04.2016
FR02.05.2016
IS20.05.2016
PT20.05.2016
Former [2018/30]HU10.04.2013
AT20.01.2016
BE20.01.2016
CY20.01.2016
CZ20.01.2016
DK20.01.2016
EE20.01.2016
ES20.01.2016
FI20.01.2016
HR20.01.2016
IT20.01.2016
LT20.01.2016
LV20.01.2016
MC20.01.2016
MK20.01.2016
NL20.01.2016
PL20.01.2016
RO20.01.2016
RS20.01.2016
SE20.01.2016
SI20.01.2016
SK20.01.2016
SM20.01.2016
IE10.04.2016
LU10.04.2016
BG20.04.2016
NO20.04.2016
GR21.04.2016
CH30.04.2016
LI30.04.2016
FR02.05.2016
IS20.05.2016
PT20.05.2016
Former [2017/38]AT20.01.2016
BE20.01.2016
CZ20.01.2016
DK20.01.2016
EE20.01.2016
ES20.01.2016
FI20.01.2016
HR20.01.2016
IT20.01.2016
LT20.01.2016
LV20.01.2016
NL20.01.2016
PL20.01.2016
RO20.01.2016
RS20.01.2016
SE20.01.2016
SI20.01.2016
SK20.01.2016
SM20.01.2016
IE10.04.2016
LU10.04.2016
BG20.04.2016
NO20.04.2016
GR21.04.2016
CH30.04.2016
LI30.04.2016
FR02.05.2016
IS20.05.2016
PT20.05.2016
Former [2017/16]AT20.01.2016
BE20.01.2016
CZ20.01.2016
DK20.01.2016
EE20.01.2016
ES20.01.2016
FI20.01.2016
HR20.01.2016
IT20.01.2016
LT20.01.2016
LV20.01.2016
NL20.01.2016
PL20.01.2016
RO20.01.2016
RS20.01.2016
SE20.01.2016
SI20.01.2016
SK20.01.2016
SM20.01.2016
LU10.04.2016
BG20.04.2016
NO20.04.2016
GR21.04.2016
CH30.04.2016
LI30.04.2016
FR02.05.2016
IS20.05.2016
PT20.05.2016
Former [2017/10]AT20.01.2016
BE20.01.2016
CZ20.01.2016
DK20.01.2016
EE20.01.2016
ES20.01.2016
FI20.01.2016
HR20.01.2016
IT20.01.2016
LT20.01.2016
LV20.01.2016
NL20.01.2016
PL20.01.2016
RO20.01.2016
RS20.01.2016
SE20.01.2016
SK20.01.2016
SM20.01.2016
LU10.04.2016
NO20.04.2016
GR21.04.2016
CH30.04.2016
LI30.04.2016
FR02.05.2016
IS20.05.2016
PT20.05.2016
Former [2017/07]AT20.01.2016
BE20.01.2016
CZ20.01.2016
DK20.01.2016
EE20.01.2016
ES20.01.2016
FI20.01.2016
HR20.01.2016
IT20.01.2016
LT20.01.2016
LV20.01.2016
NL20.01.2016
PL20.01.2016
RO20.01.2016
RS20.01.2016
SE20.01.2016
SK20.01.2016
SM20.01.2016
LU10.04.2016
NO20.04.2016
GR21.04.2016
CH30.04.2016
LI30.04.2016
IS20.05.2016
PT20.05.2016
Former [2017/04]AT20.01.2016
BE20.01.2016
CZ20.01.2016
DK20.01.2016
EE20.01.2016
ES20.01.2016
FI20.01.2016
HR20.01.2016
IT20.01.2016
LT20.01.2016
LV20.01.2016
NL20.01.2016
PL20.01.2016
RO20.01.2016
RS20.01.2016
SE20.01.2016
SK20.01.2016
SM20.01.2016
LU10.04.2016
NO20.04.2016
GR21.04.2016
IS20.05.2016
PT20.05.2016
Former [2017/03]AT20.01.2016
BE20.01.2016
CZ20.01.2016
DK20.01.2016
EE20.01.2016
ES20.01.2016
FI20.01.2016
HR20.01.2016
IT20.01.2016
LT20.01.2016
LV20.01.2016
NL20.01.2016
PL20.01.2016
RO20.01.2016
RS20.01.2016
SE20.01.2016
SK20.01.2016
SM20.01.2016
NO20.04.2016
GR21.04.2016
IS20.05.2016
PT20.05.2016
Former [2016/50]AT20.01.2016
CZ20.01.2016
DK20.01.2016
EE20.01.2016
ES20.01.2016
FI20.01.2016
HR20.01.2016
IT20.01.2016
LT20.01.2016
LV20.01.2016
NL20.01.2016
PL20.01.2016
RO20.01.2016
RS20.01.2016
SE20.01.2016
SK20.01.2016
SM20.01.2016
NO20.04.2016
GR21.04.2016
BE30.04.2016
IS20.05.2016
PT20.05.2016
Former [2016/49]AT20.01.2016
DK20.01.2016
EE20.01.2016
ES20.01.2016
FI20.01.2016
HR20.01.2016
IT20.01.2016
LT20.01.2016
LV20.01.2016
NL20.01.2016
PL20.01.2016
RS20.01.2016
SE20.01.2016
NO20.04.2016
GR21.04.2016
BE30.04.2016
IS20.05.2016
PT20.05.2016
Former [2016/46]AT20.01.2016
DK20.01.2016
ES20.01.2016
FI20.01.2016
HR20.01.2016
IT20.01.2016
LT20.01.2016
LV20.01.2016
NL20.01.2016
PL20.01.2016
RS20.01.2016
SE20.01.2016
NO20.04.2016
GR21.04.2016
BE30.04.2016
IS20.05.2016
PT20.05.2016
Former [2016/39]AT20.01.2016
ES20.01.2016
FI20.01.2016
HR20.01.2016
IT20.01.2016
LT20.01.2016
LV20.01.2016
NL20.01.2016
PL20.01.2016
RS20.01.2016
SE20.01.2016
NO20.04.2016
GR21.04.2016
BE30.04.2016
IS20.05.2016
PT20.05.2016
Former [2016/38]AT20.01.2016
ES20.01.2016
FI20.01.2016
HR20.01.2016
IT20.01.2016
LT20.01.2016
NL20.01.2016
PL20.01.2016
NO20.04.2016
GR21.04.2016
BE30.04.2016
IS20.05.2016
PT20.05.2016
Former [2016/36]AT20.01.2016
ES20.01.2016
FI20.01.2016
HR20.01.2016
IT20.01.2016
LT20.01.2016
NL20.01.2016
PL20.01.2016
NO20.04.2016
GR21.04.2016
BE30.04.2016
Former [2016/35]ES20.01.2016
FI20.01.2016
HR20.01.2016
NL20.01.2016
NO20.04.2016
GR21.04.2016
Former [2016/30]NL20.01.2016
Documents cited:Search[I]EP2527936  (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [I] 1-14 * paragraphs [0001] , [0008] , [0014] , [0034] - paragraph [0039]; figures 1,2 *;
 [I]EP2508954  (ABB TECHNOLOGY AG [CH]) [I] 1-14 * the whole document *;
 [I]  - HOERNICKE M ET AL, "Effizientes Testen heterogener Leitsystemkonfigurationen. Integration gewerkeübergreifender Hardware-Emulatoren", AUTOMATISIERUNGSTECHNISCHE PRAXIS - ATP, OLDENBOURG INDUSTRIEVERLAG, MUNCHEN, DE, (20121101), no. 11, ISSN 0178-2320, pages 46 - 54, XP009171585 [I] 1-14 * the whole document *
 [A]  - MAHALIK N G P C ET AL, "Design and development of system level software tool for DCS simulation", ADVANCES IN ENGINEERING SOFTWARE, ELSEVIER SCIENCE, OXFORD, GB, vol. 34, no. 7, doi:10.1016/S0965-9978(03)00031-0, ISSN 0965-9978, (20030701), pages 451 - 465, (20030408), XP002575547 [A] 1-14 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0965-9978(03)00031-0
by applicantDE102010025954
 EP2508904
    - M. HOERNICKE ET AL., EFFIZIENTES TESTEN HETEROGENER LEITSYSTEMKONFIGURATIONEN,
OppositionEP2527936
 EP2508954
 DE102010025954
 EP1729191
 DE102010029952
 US2008168092
 DE102006045503
 WO2012028161
 WO2007028685
 WO2007105979
 US2010042376
 WO2008090216
 US2013055196
    - HÖ$NICKE M et al., "?Effizientes Testen heterogener Leitsystemkonfigurationen. Integration gewerkeübergreifender Hardware-Emulatoren", AUTOMATISIERUNGSTECHNISCHE PRAXIS - ATP, OLDENBOURG INDUSTRIEVERLAG, MUNCHEN, DE, (20121101), ISSN 0178-2320, pages 46 - 54, XP009171585
    - MAHALIK N G P C et al., "Design and development of system level software tool for DCS simulation", ADVANCES IN ENGINEERING SOFTWARE, OXFORD , GB, (20030408), vol. 34, no. 7, ISSN 0965-9978, pages 451 - 465, XP002575547

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0965-9978(03)00031-0
    - KRAUSE, HERBERT; et al., "?Life cycle support großer Anlagen mit dem Emulator für das Leitsystem ''AC 870P / Melody", AUTOMATION 2008, Lösungen für die Zukunft, GMA- Kongress, VDI/VDE-Gesellschaft Mess- und Automatisierungstechnik, + CD-ROM, Baden- Baden, DE, (20080603), vol. 2032, ISSN 0083-5560, ISBN 978-3-18-092032-0, pages 63 - 64,
    - KRAUSE, HERBERT., "Virtual commissioning of a large LNG plant with the DCS 800XA by ABB.", 6th EUROSIM Congress on Modelling and Simulation, Ljubljana, Slovénie., (20070000), XP055318397
    - "?System 800xA mit AC 870P", ABB-Veröffentlichung, (20080000), URL: http://search- ext.abb.com/library/Download.aspx?DocumentlD=3BDD010071 &LanguageCode=de&Docu mentPartId=&Acton=Launch, XP055318401
    - HÖRNICKE M et al., "?Vollständiger Test des Automatisierungssystems - Domänenübergreifende Integration heterogener Hardware-Emulatoren in einem virtuellen Framework", Conference: Automation 2012, (20120600), URL: https://www.researchgate.net/publication/227339292, XP055318407
    - RUNDE S et al., "?Automatisierungstechnische Architektur in der Prozessindustrie mit Leitsystem in virtueller Umgebung", Tagungsband Automation, (20110000), pages 203 - 208, XP055318414
    - HÖRNICKE M et al., "?Next Generation Factory Acceptance Test", (20120000), URL: https://www.researchgate.net/publication/224341544, XP055318421
    - BARTH M et al., "Object-oriented engineering data exchange as a base for automatic generation of simulation models", Industrial Electronics, 2009. IECON '09. 35th Annual Conference of IEEE, (20090000), XP031629864