Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2765794

EP2765794 - Mobile Equipment Customization Using A Single Manufacturing Configuration [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  16.12.2016
Database last updated on 22.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 14.11.2018  [2018/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BlackBerry Limited
2200 University Avenue East
Waterloo, ON N2K 0A7 / CA
For all designated states
2236008 Ontario Inc.
2200 University Avenue East
Waterloo, ON N2K 0A7 / CA
[2016/06]
Former [2014/36]For all designated states
BlackBerry Limited
2200 University Avenue East
Waterloo, ON N2K 0A7 / CA
For all designated states
2236008 Ontario Inc.
2200 University Avenue East
Waterloo, ON N2K 0A7 / CA
Inventor(s)01 / Parry, Thomas Owen
c/o Research In Motion Limited
295 Phillip Street
Extension 72813
Waterloo, Ontario N2L 3W8 / CA
02 / Turner, Robert David
c/o QNX Software Systems Limited
1001 Farrar Road
Extension 24961
Kanata, Ontario K2K 0B3 / CA
03 / Salter, Timothy Ryan
c/o Research In Motion Limited
295 Phillip Street
Extension 79926
Waterloo, Ontario N2L 3W8 / CA
04 / Collins, Cora Lynne
c/o Research In Motion Limited
4000 Innovation Drive
Extension 13018
Ottawa, Ontario K2K 3K1 / CA
05 / Bruck, James Arthur
c/o Research In Motion Limited
4000 Innovation Drive
Extension 13906
Ottawa, Ontario K2K 3K1 / CA
06 / Sosby, David Brandon
5000 Riverside Drive
Brazos East St 100
Extension 63102
Irving, TX Texas 75039 / US
07 / Debickes, Nicole Melissa
1200 Sawgrass Corporate Pkwy
Extension 68067
Sunrise, FL Florida 33323 / US
08 / Lopez, Richard Enrique
1200 Sawgrass Corporate Parkway
Extension 68121
Sunrise, FL Florida 33323 / US
09 / Ross, Douglas Eugene
1200 Sawgrass Corporate Pkwy
Extension 68120
Sunrise, FL Florida 33323 / US
10 / Munguia, Paul
1200 Sawgrass Corporate Pkwy
Extension 68236
Sunrise, FL Florida 33323 / US
11 / Barker, Melanie Arlene
c/o QNX Software Systems Limited
1001 Farrar Road
Extension 24152
Kanata, Ontario K2K 0B3 / CA
12 / Bowyer, Martin John
Suite 302-134 Abbott St
Extension 24588
Vancouver, British Columbia V6B 2K4 / CA
 [2014/33]
Representative(s)MERH-IP Matias Erny Reichl Hoffmann Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Paul-Heyse-Strasse 29
80336 München / DE
[2016/06]
Former [2014/33]Patel, Binesh
Barker Brettell LLP
100 Hagley Road
Edgbaston
Birmingham West Midlands
B16 8QQ / GB
Application number, filing date13163391.911.04.2013
[2014/33]
Priority number, dateUS20131375318729.01.2013         Original published format: US201313753187
[2014/33]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2765794
Date:13.08.2014
Language:EN
[2014/33]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2765794
Date:10.02.2016
Language:EN
[2016/06]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP10.07.2014
ClassificationInternational:H04W8/24, // H04W8/18, H04W8/26
[2014/33]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/33]
TitleGerman:Anpassung eines mobilen Geräts mithilfe einer einzelnen Herstellungskonfiguration[2014/33]
English:Mobile Equipment Customization Using A Single Manufacturing Configuration[2014/33]
French:Personnalisation d'équipement mobile utilisant une configuration de fabrication unique[2014/33]
Examination procedure11.04.2013Examination requested  [2014/33]
11.02.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
03.08.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.12.2015Fee for grant paid
03.12.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
03.12.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)EP15198570.2  / EP3013084
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  03.08.2015
Opposition(s)11.11.2016No opposition filed within time limit [2017/03]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.04.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU11.04.2013
AL10.02.2016
AT10.02.2016
BE10.02.2016
CY10.02.2016
CZ10.02.2016
DK10.02.2016
EE10.02.2016
ES10.02.2016
FI10.02.2016
HR10.02.2016
IT10.02.2016
LT10.02.2016
LV10.02.2016
MC10.02.2016
MK10.02.2016
PL10.02.2016
RO10.02.2016
RS10.02.2016
SE10.02.2016
SI10.02.2016
SK10.02.2016
SM10.02.2016
TR10.02.2016
IE11.04.2016
LU11.04.2016
CH30.04.2016
LI30.04.2016
MT30.04.2016
BG10.05.2016
NO10.05.2016
GR11.05.2016
IS10.06.2016
PT13.06.2016
[2018/46]
Former [2018/45]HU11.04.2013
AT10.02.2016
BE10.02.2016
CY10.02.2016
CZ10.02.2016
DK10.02.2016
EE10.02.2016
ES10.02.2016
FI10.02.2016
HR10.02.2016
IT10.02.2016
LT10.02.2016
LV10.02.2016
MC10.02.2016
MK10.02.2016
PL10.02.2016
RO10.02.2016
RS10.02.2016
SE10.02.2016
SI10.02.2016
SK10.02.2016
SM10.02.2016
TR10.02.2016
IE11.04.2016
LU11.04.2016
CH30.04.2016
LI30.04.2016
MT30.04.2016
BG10.05.2016
NO10.05.2016
GR11.05.2016
IS10.06.2016
PT13.06.2016
Former [2018/32]HU11.04.2013
AT10.02.2016
BE10.02.2016
CY10.02.2016
CZ10.02.2016
DK10.02.2016
EE10.02.2016
ES10.02.2016
FI10.02.2016
HR10.02.2016
IT10.02.2016
LT10.02.2016
LV10.02.2016
MC10.02.2016
MK10.02.2016
PL10.02.2016
RO10.02.2016
RS10.02.2016
SE10.02.2016
SI10.02.2016
SK10.02.2016
SM10.02.2016
IE11.04.2016
LU11.04.2016
CH30.04.2016
LI30.04.2016
MT30.04.2016
BG10.05.2016
NO10.05.2016
GR11.05.2016
IS10.06.2016
PT13.06.2016
Former [2018/28]HU11.04.2013
AT10.02.2016
BE10.02.2016
CZ10.02.2016
DK10.02.2016
EE10.02.2016
ES10.02.2016
FI10.02.2016
HR10.02.2016
IT10.02.2016
LT10.02.2016
LV10.02.2016
MC10.02.2016
MK10.02.2016
PL10.02.2016
RO10.02.2016
RS10.02.2016
SE10.02.2016
SI10.02.2016
SK10.02.2016
SM10.02.2016
IE11.04.2016
LU11.04.2016
CH30.04.2016
LI30.04.2016
BG10.05.2016
NO10.05.2016
GR11.05.2016
IS10.06.2016
PT13.06.2016
Former [2017/38]AT10.02.2016
BE10.02.2016
CZ10.02.2016
DK10.02.2016
EE10.02.2016
ES10.02.2016
FI10.02.2016
HR10.02.2016
IT10.02.2016
LT10.02.2016
LV10.02.2016
PL10.02.2016
RO10.02.2016
RS10.02.2016
SE10.02.2016
SI10.02.2016
SK10.02.2016
SM10.02.2016
IE11.04.2016
LU11.04.2016
CH30.04.2016
LI30.04.2016
BG10.05.2016
NO10.05.2016
GR11.05.2016
IS10.06.2016
PT13.06.2016
Former [2017/16]AT10.02.2016
BE10.02.2016
CZ10.02.2016
DK10.02.2016
EE10.02.2016
ES10.02.2016
FI10.02.2016
HR10.02.2016
IT10.02.2016
LT10.02.2016
LV10.02.2016
PL10.02.2016
RO10.02.2016
RS10.02.2016
SE10.02.2016
SI10.02.2016
SK10.02.2016
SM10.02.2016
LU11.04.2016
CH30.04.2016
LI30.04.2016
BG10.05.2016
NO10.05.2016
GR11.05.2016
IS10.06.2016
PT13.06.2016
Former [2017/07]AT10.02.2016
BE10.02.2016
CZ10.02.2016
DK10.02.2016
EE10.02.2016
ES10.02.2016
FI10.02.2016
HR10.02.2016
IT10.02.2016
LT10.02.2016
LV10.02.2016
PL10.02.2016
RO10.02.2016
RS10.02.2016
SE10.02.2016
SK10.02.2016
SM10.02.2016
LU11.04.2016
CH30.04.2016
LI30.04.2016
NO10.05.2016
GR11.05.2016
IS10.06.2016
PT13.06.2016
Former [2017/04]AT10.02.2016
BE10.02.2016
CZ10.02.2016
DK10.02.2016
EE10.02.2016
ES10.02.2016
FI10.02.2016
HR10.02.2016
IT10.02.2016
LT10.02.2016
LV10.02.2016
PL10.02.2016
RO10.02.2016
RS10.02.2016
SE10.02.2016
SK10.02.2016
SM10.02.2016
LU11.04.2016
NO10.05.2016
GR11.05.2016
IS10.06.2016
PT13.06.2016
Former [2017/03]AT10.02.2016
BE10.02.2016
CZ10.02.2016
DK10.02.2016
EE10.02.2016
ES10.02.2016
FI10.02.2016
HR10.02.2016
IT10.02.2016
LT10.02.2016
LV10.02.2016
PL10.02.2016
RO10.02.2016
RS10.02.2016
SE10.02.2016
SK10.02.2016
SM10.02.2016
NO10.05.2016
GR11.05.2016
IS10.06.2016
PT13.06.2016
Former [2016/50]AT10.02.2016
CZ10.02.2016
DK10.02.2016
EE10.02.2016
ES10.02.2016
FI10.02.2016
HR10.02.2016
IT10.02.2016
LT10.02.2016
LV10.02.2016
PL10.02.2016
RO10.02.2016
RS10.02.2016
SE10.02.2016
SK10.02.2016
SM10.02.2016
BE30.04.2016
NO10.05.2016
GR11.05.2016
IS10.06.2016
PT13.06.2016
Former [2016/49]AT10.02.2016
DK10.02.2016
EE10.02.2016
ES10.02.2016
FI10.02.2016
HR10.02.2016
IT10.02.2016
LT10.02.2016
LV10.02.2016
PL10.02.2016
RS10.02.2016
SE10.02.2016
BE30.04.2016
NO10.05.2016
GR11.05.2016
IS10.06.2016
PT13.06.2016
Former [2016/46]AT10.02.2016
DK10.02.2016
ES10.02.2016
FI10.02.2016
HR10.02.2016
IT10.02.2016
LT10.02.2016
LV10.02.2016
PL10.02.2016
RS10.02.2016
SE10.02.2016
BE30.04.2016
NO10.05.2016
GR11.05.2016
IS10.06.2016
PT13.06.2016
Former [2016/39]AT10.02.2016
ES10.02.2016
FI10.02.2016
HR10.02.2016
IT10.02.2016
LT10.02.2016
LV10.02.2016
PL10.02.2016
RS10.02.2016
SE10.02.2016
BE30.04.2016
NO10.05.2016
GR11.05.2016
IS10.06.2016
PT13.06.2016
Former [2016/38]AT10.02.2016
ES10.02.2016
FI10.02.2016
HR10.02.2016
IT10.02.2016
LT10.02.2016
PL10.02.2016
BE30.04.2016
NO10.05.2016
GR11.05.2016
IS10.06.2016
PT13.06.2016
Former [2016/36]AT10.02.2016
ES10.02.2016
FI10.02.2016
HR10.02.2016
IT10.02.2016
LT10.02.2016
PL10.02.2016
BE30.04.2016
NO10.05.2016
GR11.05.2016
Former [2016/35]ES10.02.2016
FI10.02.2016
HR10.02.2016
NO10.05.2016
GR11.05.2016
Documents cited:Search[XI]US2009181662  (FLEISCHMAN DAVID [US], et al) [X] 1,13,15 * paragraph [0004] - paragraph [0005] * * paragraph [0021] * * paragraph [0089] - paragraph [0115] * * paragraph [0121] - paragraph [0123] * [I] 2-12,14;
 [XI]US2001001875  (HIRSCH ANDREW J [US]) [X] 1,13,15 * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0018] * * paragraph [0022] * [I] 2-4,6,8,9,12,14