Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2789224

EP2789224 - Mower and swathing unit [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent maintained as amended
Status updated on  27.07.2018
Database last updated on 18.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip19.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 21.11.2018  [2018/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Kverneland Group Kerteminde AS
Taarupstrandvej 25
5300 Kerteminde / DK
[2018/35]
Former [2014/42]For all designated states
Kverneland Group Kerteminde AS
Taarupstrandvej 25
5300 Kerteminde / DK
Inventor(s)01 / Jespersen, Peter
Mannehøj 12
6600 Vejen / DK
 [2014/42]
Representative(s)Stanners, David Ralph
Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP
Altius House
1 North Fourth Street
Milton Keynes MK9 1NE / GB
[2018/35]
Former [2015/23]Stanners, David Ralph
Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP The Podium
1 Eversholt Street
London NW1 2DN / GB
Former [2014/42]Raynor, Simon Mark
Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP
Altius House
1 North Fourth Street
Milton Keynes MK9 1NE / GB
Application number, filing date13163432.111.04.2013
[2014/42]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2789224
Date:15.10.2014
Language:EN
[2014/42]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2789224
Date:03.06.2015
Language:EN
[2015/23]
Type: B2 New European patent specification 
No.:EP2789224
Date:29.08.2018
Language:EN
[2018/35]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.09.2013
ClassificationInternational:A01D57/30, A01D34/71, A01D34/66
[2014/42]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/42]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Mäher- und Schwadeinheit[2014/42]
English:Mower and swathing unit[2014/42]
French:Unité tondeuse et alignement[2018/03]
Former [2014/42]Unité tondeuse et alignement
Examination procedure21.11.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
21.11.2013Examination requested  [2014/42]
19.12.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.04.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.12.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.03.2015Fee for grant paid
24.03.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
24.03.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  19.12.2013
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  03.03.2016   
PÖTTINGER Landtechnik GmbH
Industriegelände 1
4710 Grieskirchen / AT
Opponent's representative
Thoma, Michael
Lorenz Seidler Gossel
Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte
Partnerschaft mbB
Widenmayerstraße 23
80538 München / DE
 [2016/15]
08.04.2016Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
12.09.2016Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
07.12.2017Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
07.12.2017Date of oral proceedings
22.01.2018Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
22.01.2018Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
01.06.2018Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
18.07.2018Fee for printing new specification paid
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.04.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU11.04.2013
AL03.06.2015
CY03.06.2015
EE03.06.2015
HR03.06.2015
LT03.06.2015
LV03.06.2015
MC03.06.2015
MK03.06.2015
RO03.06.2015
RS03.06.2015
SI03.06.2015
SK03.06.2015
SM03.06.2015
TR03.06.2015
BG03.09.2015
GR04.09.2015
IS03.10.2015
PT06.10.2015
LU11.04.2016
MT30.04.2016
[2018/47]
Former [2018/45]HU11.04.2013
CY03.06.2015
EE03.06.2015
HR03.06.2015
LT03.06.2015
LV03.06.2015
MC03.06.2015
MK03.06.2015
RO03.06.2015
RS03.06.2015
SI03.06.2015
SK03.06.2015
SM03.06.2015
TR03.06.2015
BG03.09.2015
GR04.09.2015
IS03.10.2015
PT06.10.2015
LU11.04.2016
MT30.04.2016
Former [2018/32]HU11.04.2013
CY03.06.2015
EE03.06.2015
HR03.06.2015
LT03.06.2015
LV03.06.2015
MC03.06.2015
MK03.06.2015
RO03.06.2015
RS03.06.2015
SI03.06.2015
SK03.06.2015
SM03.06.2015
BG03.09.2015
GR04.09.2015
IS03.10.2015
PT06.10.2015
LU11.04.2016
MT30.04.2016
Former [2018/30]HU11.04.2013
CY03.06.2015
EE03.06.2015
HR03.06.2015
LT03.06.2015
LV03.06.2015
MC03.06.2015
MK03.06.2015
RO03.06.2015
RS03.06.2015
SI03.06.2015
SK03.06.2015
SM03.06.2015
BG03.09.2015
GR04.09.2015
IS03.10.2015
PT06.10.2015
LU11.04.2016
Former [2018/29]HU11.04.2013
EE03.06.2015
HR03.06.2015
LT03.06.2015
LV03.06.2015
MC03.06.2015
MK03.06.2015
RO03.06.2015
RS03.06.2015
SI03.06.2015
SK03.06.2015
SM03.06.2015
BG03.09.2015
GR04.09.2015
IS03.10.2015
PT06.10.2015
LU11.04.2016
Former [2017/04]EE03.06.2015
HR03.06.2015
LT03.06.2015
LV03.06.2015
RO03.06.2015
RS03.06.2015
SI03.06.2015
SK03.06.2015
BG03.09.2015
GR04.09.2015
IS03.10.2015
PT06.10.2015
LU11.04.2016
Former [2016/24]EE03.06.2015
HR03.06.2015
LT03.06.2015
LV03.06.2015
RO03.06.2015
RS03.06.2015
SI03.06.2015
SK03.06.2015
BG03.09.2015
GR04.09.2015
IS03.10.2015
PT06.10.2015
Former [2016/10]EE03.06.2015
HR03.06.2015
LT03.06.2015
LV03.06.2015
RO03.06.2015
RS03.06.2015
SK03.06.2015
BG03.09.2015
GR04.09.2015
IS03.10.2015
PT06.10.2015
Former [2016/09]EE03.06.2015
HR03.06.2015
LT03.06.2015
LV03.06.2015
RS03.06.2015
BG03.09.2015
GR04.09.2015
Former [2015/50]HR03.06.2015
LT03.06.2015
LV03.06.2015
RS03.06.2015
BG03.09.2015
GR04.09.2015
Former [2015/49]HR03.06.2015
LT03.06.2015
LV03.06.2015
RS03.06.2015
GR04.09.2015