Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2789303

EP2789303 - Implantable insert sleeve [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  28.08.2015
Database last updated on 19.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip28.08.2015Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 30.09.2015  [2015/40]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Zimmer GmbH
Sulzer Allee 8
8404 Winterthur / CH
[2014/42]
Inventor(s)01 / Velikov, Jordan
Tüfweg 3
8044 Gockhausen / CH
02 / Teschke, Thomas
Kapellaweg 23
FL-9491 Ruggell / LI
 [2014/42]
Representative(s)Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB
Martin-Greif-Strasse 1
80336 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/42]Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR
Martin-Greif-Strasse 1
80336 München / DE
Application number, filing date13163522.912.04.2013
[2014/42]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2789303
Date:15.10.2014
Language:EN
[2014/42]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.09.2013
ClassificationInternational:A61B17/80, A61B17/86, A61B17/00
[2014/42]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/42]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Implantierbare Einsetzhülse[2014/42]
English:Implantable insert sleeve[2014/42]
French:Manchon d'insertion implantable[2014/42]
Examination procedure12.04.2013Examination requested  [2014/42]
16.04.2015Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2015/40]
15.05.2015Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2015/40]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.04.201503   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XI]US2011319942  (BOTTLANG MICHAEL [US], et al) [X] 1,2,5-12 * paragraph [0089] - paragraph [0091]; figures 10A-10F * * figures 11A-11C, 17A * [I] 3,4,13-15;
 [XI]US2004220570  (FRIGG ROBERT [CH]) [X] 1,2,5-12 * paragraph [0039] - paragraph [0041]; figures 1,2 * [I] 3,4,13-15;
 [X]US2001014807  (WAGNER ERIK J [US], et al) [X] 1,2 * figures 12,13 *;
 [XI]US2012016365  (FREID JIM [US], et al) [X] 1,2,7,8,11,12 * figures 19,20 * [I] 13-15;
 [X]US2012303071  (BLACK MICHAEL [US], et al) [X] 1 * figures 21-24 *