Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2789972

EP2789972 - Measuring device with deformable optical element [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  22.06.2018
Database last updated on 21.10.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  14.07.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  06.07.2017
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  19.05.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  06.03.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip11.10.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AT
published on 13.11.2019 [2019/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Hexagon Technology Center GmbH
Heinrich-Wild-Strasse
9435 Heerbrugg / CH
[2014/42]
Inventor(s)01 / Hinderling, Jürg
Gehrenstrasse 11
CH-9437 Marbach / CH
02 / Scheja, Jochen
Berneckerstrasse 215
CH-9435 Heerbrugg / CH
03 / Dumoulin, Charles Leopold Elisabeth
Hauptstrasse 30
CH-9436 Balgach / CH
04 / Iseli, Claudio
Industriestrasse 5b
CH-9434 Au / CH
 [2014/42]
Representative(s)Kaminski Harmann
Patentanwälte AG
Landstrasse 124
9490 Vaduz / LI
[N/P]
Former [2014/42]Gyaja, Christoph Benjamin
Kaminski Harmann
Patentanwälte AG
Landstrasse 124
9490 Vaduz / LI
Application number, filing date13163545.012.04.2013
[2014/42]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2789972
Date:15.10.2014
Language:DE
[2014/42]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2789972
Date:16.08.2017
Language:DE
[2017/33]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.09.2013
ClassificationInternational:G01C15/00, G02B3/14, G02B26/08
[2014/42]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/22]
Former [2014/42]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:Vermessungsgerät mit verformbarem optischem Element[2014/42]
English:Measuring device with deformable optical element[2014/42]
French:Appareil de mesure avec élément optique déformable[2014/42]
Examination procedure15.04.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
15.04.2015Examination requested  [2015/22]
07.03.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.05.2017Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
03.05.2017Fee for grant paid
03.05.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
05.07.2017Information about intention to grant a patent
05.07.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  07.03.2017
Opposition(s)17.05.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/30]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.04.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
29.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
21.04.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCZ16.08.2017
DK16.08.2017
EE16.08.2017
ES16.08.2017
FI16.08.2017
HR16.08.2017
IT16.08.2017
LT16.08.2017
LV16.08.2017
MC16.08.2017
MT16.08.2017
PL16.08.2017
RO16.08.2017
RS16.08.2017
SI16.08.2017
SK16.08.2017
SM16.08.2017
BG16.11.2017
NO16.11.2017
GR17.11.2017
IS16.12.2017
AT12.04.2018
IE12.04.2018
LU12.04.2018
BE30.04.2018
[2019/46]
Former [2019/19]CZ16.08.2017
DK16.08.2017
EE16.08.2017
ES16.08.2017
FI16.08.2017
HR16.08.2017
IT16.08.2017
LT16.08.2017
LV16.08.2017
MC16.08.2017
MT16.08.2017
PL16.08.2017
RO16.08.2017
RS16.08.2017
SI16.08.2017
SK16.08.2017
SM16.08.2017
BG16.11.2017
NO16.11.2017
GR17.11.2017
IS16.12.2017
IE12.04.2018
LU12.04.2018
BE30.04.2018
Former [2019/12]CZ16.08.2017
DK16.08.2017
EE16.08.2017
ES16.08.2017
FI16.08.2017
HR16.08.2017
IT16.08.2017
LT16.08.2017
LV16.08.2017
MC16.08.2017
MT16.08.2017
PL16.08.2017
RO16.08.2017
RS16.08.2017
SI16.08.2017
SK16.08.2017
SM16.08.2017
BG16.11.2017
NO16.11.2017
GR17.11.2017
IS16.12.2017
LU12.04.2018
BE30.04.2018
Former [2019/08]CZ16.08.2017
DK16.08.2017
EE16.08.2017
ES16.08.2017
FI16.08.2017
HR16.08.2017
IT16.08.2017
LT16.08.2017
LV16.08.2017
MC16.08.2017
MT16.08.2017
PL16.08.2017
RO16.08.2017
RS16.08.2017
SI16.08.2017
SK16.08.2017
SM16.08.2017
BG16.11.2017
NO16.11.2017
GR17.11.2017
IS16.12.2017
LU12.04.2018
Former [2018/52]CZ16.08.2017
DK16.08.2017
EE16.08.2017
ES16.08.2017
FI16.08.2017
HR16.08.2017
IT16.08.2017
LT16.08.2017
LV16.08.2017
MC16.08.2017
MT16.08.2017
PL16.08.2017
RO16.08.2017
RS16.08.2017
SI16.08.2017
SK16.08.2017
SM16.08.2017
BG16.11.2017
NO16.11.2017
GR17.11.2017
IS16.12.2017
Former [2018/43]CZ16.08.2017
DK16.08.2017
EE16.08.2017
ES16.08.2017
FI16.08.2017
HR16.08.2017
IT16.08.2017
LT16.08.2017
LV16.08.2017
MT16.08.2017
PL16.08.2017
RO16.08.2017
RS16.08.2017
SI16.08.2017
SK16.08.2017
SM16.08.2017
BG16.11.2017
NO16.11.2017
GR17.11.2017
IS16.12.2017
Former [2018/39]CZ16.08.2017
DK16.08.2017
EE16.08.2017
ES16.08.2017
FI16.08.2017
HR16.08.2017
IT16.08.2017
LT16.08.2017
LV16.08.2017
PL16.08.2017
RO16.08.2017
RS16.08.2017
SI16.08.2017
SK16.08.2017
SM16.08.2017
BG16.11.2017
NO16.11.2017
GR17.11.2017
IS16.12.2017
Former [2018/24]CZ16.08.2017
DK16.08.2017
EE16.08.2017
ES16.08.2017
FI16.08.2017
HR16.08.2017
IT16.08.2017
LT16.08.2017
LV16.08.2017
PL16.08.2017
RO16.08.2017
RS16.08.2017
SK16.08.2017
SM16.08.2017
BG16.11.2017
NO16.11.2017
GR17.11.2017
IS16.12.2017
Former [2018/21]CZ16.08.2017
DK16.08.2017
ES16.08.2017
FI16.08.2017
HR16.08.2017
LT16.08.2017
LV16.08.2017
PL16.08.2017
RS16.08.2017
BG16.11.2017
NO16.11.2017
GR17.11.2017
IS16.12.2017
Former [2018/12]ES16.08.2017
FI16.08.2017
HR16.08.2017
LT16.08.2017
LV16.08.2017
PL16.08.2017
RS16.08.2017
BG16.11.2017
NO16.11.2017
GR17.11.2017
IS16.12.2017
Former [2018/11]ES16.08.2017
FI16.08.2017
HR16.08.2017
LT16.08.2017
PL16.08.2017
RS16.08.2017
BG16.11.2017
NO16.11.2017
GR17.11.2017
IS16.12.2017
Former [2018/08]FI16.08.2017
LT16.08.2017
NO16.11.2017
Former [2018/07]LT16.08.2017
NO16.11.2017
Documents cited:Search[YD]US2012224164  (HAYASHI KUNIHIRO [JP] ET AL) [YD] 1-15 * paragraphs [0036] - [0040] - [0047] , [0048] , [0105] , [0132]; figure 17 *;
 [YD]US2010295987  (BERGE BRUNO [FR] BERGE BRUNO [FR] ET AL) [YD] 1-15 * paragraphs [0042] - [0052] - [0065] , [0066]; figures 2-8 *
by applicantUS6873407
 CN201892533U
 US2011080477
 EP1081459
 US2012127455
 WO2012033892
 WO2007079600
 WO2010148525
 EP1757956
 JP4843128B
 EP1311873
 EP1450128
 EP1882959
 EP1043602
 WO2006063739
 WO2011141447
 EP1791082
 JP3748112B
 GB2353862
 US2012224164
 EP1684084
 US2012063000
 WO2012035026
 WO2008037787
 US2010295987
 US2012026596
 EP2009468
 USRE39874E
 WO2008095923
 WO2012EP58656