Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2667291

EP2667291 - Method and apparatus for moving an object [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  04.11.2014
Database last updated on 14.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip03.05.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.
129, Samsung-ro
Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si
Gyeonggi-do 443-742 / KR
[N/P]
Former [2013/48]For all designated states
Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd
129, Samsung-ro
Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si
Gyeonggi-do 443-742 / KR
Inventor(s)01 / Kwon, Woo-Up
No 102-1403, 216, Wonhyo-ro
Yongsan-gu
Seoul / KR
 [2013/48]
Representative(s)HGF Limited
Saviour House
9 St. Saviourgate
York YO1 8NQ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2013/48]Birchenough, Lewis
Harrison Goddard Foote LLP
Saviour House
9 St Saviourgate
York YO1 8NQ / GB
Application number, filing date13163619.312.04.2013
[2013/48]
Priority number, dateKR2012004639302.05.2012         Original published format: KR 20120046393
[2013/48]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2667291
Date:27.11.2013
Language:EN
[2013/48]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.10.2013
ClassificationInternational:G06F3/0485, G06F3/0346
[2013/48]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2013/48]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Bewegung eines Objekts[2013/48]
English:Method and apparatus for moving an object[2013/48]
French:Procédé et appareil pour déplacer un objet[2013/48]
Examination procedure12.04.2013Examination requested  [2013/48]
22.05.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
02.07.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
31.10.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.03.2018Date of oral proceedings
29.03.2018Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
29.03.2018Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Appeal following examination30.05.2018Appeal received No.  T2033/18
30.07.2018Statement of grounds filed
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  02.07.2014
Fees paidRenewal fee
06.03.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
29.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
07.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
23.04.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
26.04.2019Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[X]US2009262074  (NASIRI STEVEN S [US] ET AL) [X] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0040] - [0042] - [0061] - [0063] - [0 71] - [0074] - [0100] , [0101] * * claims 25,34 *;
 [X]EP2408181  (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [X] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0083] , [0092] , [0113] * * claims 1-4 *;
 [X]US2011296351  (EWING JR RICHARD ALAN [US] ET AL) [X] 1-15 * figures 6A,6D * * paragraph [0050] - paragraph [0055] *;
 [XI]US2011063216  (ORR KEVIN [CA] ET AL ORR KEVIN HOWARD [CA] ET AL) [X] 1-6,8-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0033] * * claims 1,9 * [I] 7