Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2792377

EP2792377 - Medical infrastructure and medical monitoring apparatus for surveillance of patients over a plurality of extracorporeal blood treatment sessions [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  29.09.2017
Database last updated on 21.10.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  21.12.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip29.09.2017Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 01.11.2017  [2017/44]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Gambro Lundia AB
P.O. Box 10101
220 10 Lund / SE
[2014/43]
Inventor(s)01 / Bene, Bernard
Gambro Industries, R&D
No. 35, rue de la Visina
69540 Irigny / FR
02 / Vantard, Georges
Gambro Industries
33 Rue de la Noyera
Cidex 342bis
38090 Villefontaine / FR
 [2014/43]
Representative(s)Ponzellini, Gianmarco , et al
PGA S.p.A.
PLS See message P.Soeteway in File 00940761.0 -
Via Mascheroni, 31
20145 Milano / IT
[N/P]
Former [2014/43]Ponzellini, Gianmarco , et al
Ponzellini, Gioia e Associati S.r.l. Via Mascheroni, 31
20145 Milano / IT
Application number, filing date13163728.215.04.2013
[2014/43]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2792377
Date:22.10.2014
Language:EN
[2014/43]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.09.2013
ClassificationInternational:A61M1/16, A61M1/36
[2014/43]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/22]
Former [2014/43]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Medizinische Infrastruktur und medizinische Überwachungsvorrichtung zur Beobachtung von Patienten über eine Vielzahl von Sitzungen zur extrakorporalen Blutbehandlung[2014/43]
English:Medical infrastructure and medical monitoring apparatus for surveillance of patients over a plurality of extracorporeal blood treatment sessions[2014/43]
French:Infrastructure médicale et appareil de supervision médicale pour la surveillance de patients sur une pluralité de sessions de traitement sanguin extracorporel[2014/43]
Examination procedure17.04.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
17.04.2015Examination requested  [2015/22]
22.12.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.05.2017Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2017/44]
08.06.2017Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2017/44]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  22.12.2016
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.04.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
30.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.04.201705   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[AD]WO2008087470  (GAMBRO LUNDIA AB [SE]; BENE BERNARD [FR]) [AD] 1-20 * abstract * * pages 7-13 *;
 [A]US2008097272  (DANIEL PIA [DE] ET AL) [A] 1-20 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2012298581  (WEHMEYER WOLFGANG [DE] ET AL) [A] 1-20 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2009054822  (MURAKAMI TOMOYA [JP] ET AL) [A] 1-20 * the whole document *
 [ID]  - L MERCADAL, B COEVOET, N ALBADAWY, S HACINI, B BENE, G DERAY, T PETITCLERC, "Analysis of the optical concentration curve to detect access recirculation", KIDNEY INTERNATIONAL, (20060202), vol. 69, no. 4, doi:10.1038/sj.ki.5000154, ISSN 0085-2538, pages 769 - 771, XP008164511 [ID] 1-20 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/sj.ki.5000154
by applicantUS5685989
 US5595182
 US5453576
 US5510716
 US5510717
 US5312550
 EP0928614
 WO0024440
 WO2008087470
 EP0547025
 EP0658352
 EP0920877
 US2001004523
    - SULLIVAN; MERCADAL; COEVOET; ALBADAWY; HACINI; BENE; DERAY; PETITELERC, "Analysis of the optical concentration curve to detect access recirculation", KIDNEY INT., (2006), vol. 69, no. 4, doi:doi:10.1038/sj.ki.5000154, pages 769 - 7, XP008164511

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/sj.ki.5000154
    - GOTCH FA; SARGENT SA., "A mechanistic analysis of the National Cooperative Dialysis Study (NCDS", KIDNEY INT, (1985), vol. 28, pages 526 - 34