EP2792531 - Preventing of slip in an electrically powered vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 18.08.2017 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.08.2017 | Withdrawal of application | published on 20.09.2017 [2017/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ABB Oy Strömbergintie 1 00380 Helsinki / FI | [2014/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Talja, Markku ABB Oy Hiomotie 13 00380 Helsinki / FI | [2014/43] | Representative(s) | Kolster Oy Ab (Salmisaarenaukio 1) P.O. Box 204 00181 Helsinki / FI | [N/P] |
Former [2014/43] | Kolster Oy Ab Iso Roobertinkatu 23 PO Box 148 00121 Helsinki / FI | Application number, filing date | 13163841.3 | 16.04.2013 | [2014/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2792531 | Date: | 22.10.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.09.2013 | Classification | IPC: | B60L3/10, B60L15/20, B60W10/08 | [2014/43] | CPC: |
B60L3/102 (EP,US);
B60L15/20 (US);
B60K28/16 (EP,US);
B60L15/2036 (EP,US);
B60L3/108 (EP,US);
B60W10/08 (EP,US);
B60L2240/14 (EP,US);
B60L2240/463 (EP,US);
B60W2710/083 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/22] |
Former [2014/43] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verhindern des Schlupfes in einem Elektrofahrzeug | [2014/43] | English: | Preventing of slip in an electrically powered vehicle | [2014/43] | French: | Prévention de glissement dans un véhicule alimenté électriquement | [2014/43] | Examination procedure | 21.04.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.04.2015 | Examination requested [2015/22] | 14.08.2017 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2017/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO2005012026 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP], et al) [Y] 1-6 * page 11, line 26; figures 1,2,3,4,5,9-12 * * page 10, line 25 - page 11, line 19 * * page 12, line 1 - line 7 * * page 14, line 7 - page 15, line 20 * * page 21, line 1 - page 23, line 26 * * page 24, line 10 - page 25, line 6 * * page 26, line 5 - page 27, line 15 *; | [A]US2005228546 (NAIK SANJEEV M [US], et al) [A] 4,5 * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0030]; figures 4-8 *; | [A]DE102006013381 (CONTI TEMIC MICROELECTRONIC [DE]) [A] 4,5* paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0041]; figures 4-7; claims 1-3 *; | [Y]EP2527190 (HITACHI CONSTRUCTION MACHINERY [JP]) [Y] 1-6 * paragraph [0001]; figures 1,2,6 * * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0034] * |