blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2653951

EP2653951 - Apparatus and method for controlling power of external memory in mobile terminal [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  19.08.2022
Database last updated on 15.06.2024
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  11.12.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  12.01.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip19.08.2022Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 21.09.2022  [2022/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.
129, Samsung-ro
Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si
Gyeonggi-do 443-742 / KR
[N/P]
Former [2013/43]For all designated states
Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd
129, Samsung-ro
Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si
Gyeonggi-do 443-742 / KR
Inventor(s)01 / Lee, Won Wook
c/o Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.
129 Samsung-ro, Yeongtong-gu, Suwon-si
443-742 Gyeonggi-do / KR
 [2013/43]
Representative(s)Nederlandsch Octrooibureau
P.O. Box 29720
2502 LS The Hague / NL
[2013/43]
Application number, filing date13163846.216.04.2013
[2013/43]
Priority number, dateKR2012004100019.04.2012         Original published format: KR 20120041000
[2013/43]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2653951
Date:23.10.2013
Language:EN
[2013/43]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2653951
Date:04.10.2017
Language:EN
[2017/40]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.09.2017
ClassificationIPC:G06F1/26, G06F1/28
[2013/43]
CPC:
G06F1/266 (EP,US); G06F1/26 (KR); G06F1/3287 (US);
G06F1/28 (EP,US); G06F1/30 (KR); H04B1/40 (KR)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/07]
Former [2013/43]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur Leistungsregelung eines externen Speichers in einem mobilen Endgerät[2013/43]
English:Apparatus and method for controlling power of external memory in mobile terminal[2013/43]
French:Appareil et procédé de commande de puissance de mémoire externe dans un terminal mobile[2013/43]
Examination procedure16.04.2013Date on which the examining division has become responsible
02.01.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
02.01.2018Examination requested  [2018/07]
16.12.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.04.2020Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.10.2020Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
11.02.2021Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.12.2021Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
29.04.2022Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2022/38]
17.05.2022Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2022/38]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  16.12.2019
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.03.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
29.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
27.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
23.04.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
26.04.2019Renewal fee patent year 07
22.04.2020Renewal fee patent year 08
21.04.2021Renewal fee patent year 09
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.04.202210   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[XI]US6247079  (PAPA STEPHEN E J [US], et al) [X] 1-3,9-11 * column 2, line 53 - column 8, line 38; figure 1 * [I] 4,12;
 [X]US2010131707  (CHI MING-HSUN [TW], et al) [X] 1,9 * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0031]; figures 2A-2B *;
 [X]EP2339428  (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [X] 1,9* paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0037]; figures 2,3 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.