Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2792833

EP2792833 - Sliding door arrangement [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  06.04.2018
Database last updated on 19.10.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  28.04.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  16.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip23.11.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MC
published on 26.12.2018  [2018/52]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Elfa International AB
Elfagatan 5
593 87 Västervik / SE
[2014/43]
Inventor(s)01 / Nilsson, Peter
Första Västralundsgatan 27C
SE-593 37 Västervik / SE
 [2014/43]
Representative(s)Industripatent i Växjö AB
Box 3130
350 43 Växjö / SE
[N/P]
Former [2017/22]Awapatent AB
P.O. Box 99
351 04 Växjö / SE
Former [2014/43]Hjalmarsson, Magnus Axel
Awapatent AB
P.O. Box 99
351 04 Växjö / SE
Application number, filing date13163929.616.04.2013
[2014/43]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2792833
Date:22.10.2014
Language:EN
[2014/43]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2792833
Date:31.05.2017
Language:EN
[2017/22]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.08.2013
ClassificationInternational:E05F5/00, E05F1/16
[2014/43]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/22]
Former [2014/43]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:Schiebetüranordnung[2014/43]
English:Sliding door arrangement[2014/43]
French:Agencement de porte coulissante[2014/43]
Examination procedure20.04.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
20.04.2015Examination requested  [2015/22]
17.11.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.03.2017Fee for grant paid
17.03.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
17.03.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  17.11.2016
Opposition(s)01.03.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/19]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.03.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
06.04.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
20.04.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT31.05.2017
CZ31.05.2017
EE31.05.2017
ES31.05.2017
HR31.05.2017
IT31.05.2017
LT31.05.2017
LV31.05.2017
MC31.05.2017
NL31.05.2017
RO31.05.2017
RS31.05.2017
SI31.05.2017
SK31.05.2017
SM31.05.2017
BG31.08.2017
GR01.09.2017
IS30.09.2017
[2018/52]
Former [2018/25]AT31.05.2017
CZ31.05.2017
EE31.05.2017
ES31.05.2017
HR31.05.2017
IT31.05.2017
LT31.05.2017
LV31.05.2017
NL31.05.2017
RO31.05.2017
RS31.05.2017
SI31.05.2017
SK31.05.2017
SM31.05.2017
BG31.08.2017
GR01.09.2017
IS30.09.2017
Former [2018/11]AT31.05.2017
CZ31.05.2017
EE31.05.2017
ES31.05.2017
HR31.05.2017
IT31.05.2017
LT31.05.2017
LV31.05.2017
NL31.05.2017
RO31.05.2017
RS31.05.2017
SK31.05.2017
SM31.05.2017
BG31.08.2017
GR01.09.2017
IS30.09.2017
Former [2018/10]AT31.05.2017
CZ31.05.2017
EE31.05.2017
ES31.05.2017
HR31.05.2017
LT31.05.2017
LV31.05.2017
NL31.05.2017
RO31.05.2017
RS31.05.2017
SK31.05.2017
BG31.08.2017
GR01.09.2017
IS30.09.2017
Former [2018/09]AT31.05.2017
EE31.05.2017
ES31.05.2017
HR31.05.2017
LT31.05.2017
LV31.05.2017
NL31.05.2017
RS31.05.2017
BG31.08.2017
GR01.09.2017
IS30.09.2017
Former [2017/52]AT31.05.2017
ES31.05.2017
HR31.05.2017
LT31.05.2017
LV31.05.2017
NL31.05.2017
RS31.05.2017
BG31.08.2017
GR01.09.2017
IS30.09.2017
Former [2017/50]AT31.05.2017
ES31.05.2017
HR31.05.2017
LT31.05.2017
LV31.05.2017
RS31.05.2017
BG31.08.2017
GR01.09.2017
IS30.09.2017
Former [2017/49]AT31.05.2017
ES31.05.2017
HR31.05.2017
LT31.05.2017
GR01.09.2017
IS30.09.2017
Documents cited:Search[XAI]JP2005290769  (MURAKOSHI MFG CORP) [X] 1,2 * paragraphs [0023] , [0036]; figures 1,5 * [A] 3-5,7-11 [I] 6;
 [XDAI]EP2372064  (ELFA INT AB [SE]) [XD] 1,2 * abstract * [A] 3-5,7-11 [I] 6
by applicantEP2372064
 EP2372066