Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2792855

EP2792855 - Inner bearing block of an exhaust gas turbocharger [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2014/43]Rotor block of an exhaust gas turbocharger
[2018/41]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  16.08.2019
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  07.09.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  30.05.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip30.08.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): SK
published on 02.10.2019  [2019/40]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ABB Turbo Systems AG
Bruggerstrasse 71a
5400 Baden / CH
[2014/43]
Inventor(s)01 / Oeschger, Daniel
Seminarstrasse 76
5430 Wettingen / CH
02 / Rechin, Thomas
Mellingerstrasse 130c
5400 Baden / CH
 [2014/43]
Representative(s)Zimmermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB
Postfach 330 920
80069 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/43]ABB Patent Attorneys
C/o ABB Schweiz AG
Intellectual Property (CH-LC/IP)
Brown Boveri Strasse 6
5400 Baden / CH
Application number, filing date13164289.418.04.2013
[2014/43]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2792855
Date:22.10.2014
Language:DE
[2014/43]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2792855
Date:10.10.2018
Language:DE
[2018/41]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.11.2013
ClassificationInternational:F01D25/16, F02B39/00, F02C6/12
[2014/43]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/21]
Former [2014/43]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:Inneres Lagergehäuse eines Abgasturboladers[2018/41]
English:Inner bearing block of an exhaust gas turbocharger[2018/41]
French:Support de palier interieur d'un turbocompresseur[2018/41]
Former [2014/43]Rotorblock eines Abgasturboladers
Former [2014/43]Rotor block of an exhaust gas turbocharger
Former [2014/43]Bloc rotor d'une turbosoufflante de gaz d'échappement
Examination procedure08.04.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
08.04.2015Examination requested  [2015/21]
31.05.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.08.2018Fee for grant paid
21.08.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
21.08.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  31.05.2018
Opposition(s)11.07.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/38]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.04.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
29.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
21.04.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
23.04.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL10.10.2018
CZ10.10.2018
DK10.10.2018
EE10.10.2018
ES10.10.2018
FI10.10.2018
HR10.10.2018
IT10.10.2018
LT10.10.2018
LV10.10.2018
NL10.10.2018
PL10.10.2018
RO10.10.2018
RS10.10.2018
SE10.10.2018
SK10.10.2018
SM10.10.2018
BG10.01.2019
NO10.01.2019
GR11.01.2019
IS10.02.2019
PT10.02.2019
[2019/40]
Former [2019/37]AL10.10.2018
CZ10.10.2018
DK10.10.2018
EE10.10.2018
ES10.10.2018
FI10.10.2018
HR10.10.2018
IT10.10.2018
LT10.10.2018
LV10.10.2018
NL10.10.2018
PL10.10.2018
RO10.10.2018
RS10.10.2018
SE10.10.2018
SM10.10.2018
BG10.01.2019
NO10.01.2019
GR11.01.2019
IS10.02.2019
PT10.02.2019
Former [2019/35]AL10.10.2018
CZ10.10.2018
DK10.10.2018
ES10.10.2018
FI10.10.2018
HR10.10.2018
IT10.10.2018
LT10.10.2018
LV10.10.2018
NL10.10.2018
PL10.10.2018
RS10.10.2018
SE10.10.2018
BG10.01.2019
NO10.01.2019
GR11.01.2019
IS10.02.2019
PT10.02.2019
Former [2019/34]AL10.10.2018
DK10.10.2018
ES10.10.2018
FI10.10.2018
HR10.10.2018
IT10.10.2018
LT10.10.2018
LV10.10.2018
NL10.10.2018
PL10.10.2018
RS10.10.2018
SE10.10.2018
BG10.01.2019
NO10.01.2019
GR11.01.2019
IS10.02.2019
PT10.02.2019
Former [2019/26]AL10.10.2018
ES10.10.2018
FI10.10.2018
HR10.10.2018
LT10.10.2018
LV10.10.2018
NL10.10.2018
PL10.10.2018
RS10.10.2018
SE10.10.2018
BG10.01.2019
NO10.01.2019
GR11.01.2019
IS10.02.2019
PT10.02.2019
Former [2019/25]ES10.10.2018
FI10.10.2018
HR10.10.2018
LT10.10.2018
LV10.10.2018
NL10.10.2018
PL10.10.2018
RS10.10.2018
SE10.10.2018
BG10.01.2019
NO10.01.2019
GR11.01.2019
IS10.02.2019
Former [2019/24]ES10.10.2018
FI10.10.2018
HR10.10.2018
LT10.10.2018
LV10.10.2018
NL10.10.2018
PL10.10.2018
SE10.10.2018
BG10.01.2019
NO10.01.2019
GR11.01.2019
IS10.02.2019
Former [2019/23]ES10.10.2018
FI10.10.2018
HR10.10.2018
LT10.10.2018
LV10.10.2018
NL10.10.2018
PL10.10.2018
BG10.01.2019
NO10.01.2019
IS10.02.2019
Former [2019/22]FI10.10.2018
LT10.10.2018
NL10.10.2018
PL10.10.2018
BG10.01.2019
NO10.01.2019
IS10.02.2019
Former [2019/21]FI10.10.2018
LT10.10.2018
NL10.10.2018
NO10.01.2019
IS10.02.2019
Former [2019/20]LT10.10.2018
NL10.10.2018
NO10.01.2019
Former [2019/17]NL10.10.2018
Documents cited:Search[X]JPH09217631  (ISHIKAWAJIMA HARIMA HEAVY IND) [X] 1,4,5 * paragraphs [0008] , [0012] - [0015]; figures 1-3 *;
 [A]US4376617  (OKANO HIROSHI [JP] ET AL) [A] 1-5 * column 5, lines 1-18; figures 1,4-6 *;
 [A]JPS61142328  (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD) [A] 1-5 * the whole document *;
 [A]JPH09217630  (ISHIKAWAJIMA HARIMA HEAVY IND) [A] 1-5 * the whole document *;
 [AD]EP1057978  (MAN B & W DIESEL LTD [GB]) [AD] 1-5 * figure 8 *
by applicantEP1057978