Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2792963

EP2792963 - Condensed water discharge for roof ventilators [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  26.05.2017
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  19.01.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip23.11.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MC
published on 26.12.2018  [2018/52]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Tebest, Arnd
Rosenweg 4
47652 Weeze / DE
For all designated states
Geschwandtner, Rainer
Am Prinzenbusch 3
46414 Rhede / DE
[2014/43]
Inventor(s)01 / Tebest, Arnd
Rosenweg 4
47652 Weeze / DE
 [2014/43]
Representative(s)RCD Patent Giesen, Schmelcher & Griebel Patentwanwälte PartG mbB
Kaiserstraße 100
52134 Herzogenrath / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/43]Michalski Hüttermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB
Speditionstraße 21
40221 Düsseldorf / DE
Application number, filing date13164349.618.04.2013
[2014/43]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2792963
Date:22.10.2014
Language:DE
[2014/43]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2792963
Date:28.06.2017
Language:DE
[2017/26]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.09.2013
ClassificationInternational:F24F13/22, F24H8/00, F16L55/07, F24F13/02
[2014/43]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/22]
Former [2014/43]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:Kondenswasserabführung für Dachentlüfter[2014/43]
English:Condensed water discharge for roof ventilators[2014/43]
French:Evacuation de condensat pour aérateur de toiture[2014/43]
Examination procedure15.04.2015Examination requested  [2015/22]
22.04.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
22.02.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
29.08.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.01.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.05.2017Fee for grant paid
22.05.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
22.05.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  22.02.2016
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.04.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
15.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
26.04.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCZ28.06.2017
DK28.06.2017
EE28.06.2017
ES28.06.2017
FI28.06.2017
HR28.06.2017
IT28.06.2017
LT28.06.2017
LV28.06.2017
MC28.06.2017
MT28.06.2017
NL28.06.2017
PL28.06.2017
RO28.06.2017
RS28.06.2017
SE28.06.2017
SI28.06.2017
SK28.06.2017
SM28.06.2017
BG28.09.2017
NO28.09.2017
GR29.09.2017
IS28.10.2017
[2018/52]
Former [2018/43]CZ28.06.2017
DK28.06.2017
EE28.06.2017
ES28.06.2017
FI28.06.2017
HR28.06.2017
IT28.06.2017
LT28.06.2017
LV28.06.2017
MT28.06.2017
NL28.06.2017
PL28.06.2017
RO28.06.2017
RS28.06.2017
SE28.06.2017
SI28.06.2017
SK28.06.2017
SM28.06.2017
BG28.09.2017
NO28.09.2017
GR29.09.2017
IS28.10.2017
Former [2018/39]CZ28.06.2017
DK28.06.2017
EE28.06.2017
ES28.06.2017
FI28.06.2017
HR28.06.2017
IT28.06.2017
LT28.06.2017
LV28.06.2017
NL28.06.2017
PL28.06.2017
RO28.06.2017
RS28.06.2017
SE28.06.2017
SI28.06.2017
SK28.06.2017
SM28.06.2017
BG28.09.2017
NO28.09.2017
GR29.09.2017
IS28.10.2017
Former [2018/21]CZ28.06.2017
DK28.06.2017
EE28.06.2017
ES28.06.2017
FI28.06.2017
HR28.06.2017
IT28.06.2017
LT28.06.2017
LV28.06.2017
NL28.06.2017
PL28.06.2017
RO28.06.2017
RS28.06.2017
SE28.06.2017
SK28.06.2017
SM28.06.2017
BG28.09.2017
NO28.09.2017
GR29.09.2017
IS28.10.2017
Former [2018/11]CZ28.06.2017
EE28.06.2017
ES28.06.2017
FI28.06.2017
HR28.06.2017
IT28.06.2017
LT28.06.2017
LV28.06.2017
NL28.06.2017
PL28.06.2017
RO28.06.2017
RS28.06.2017
SE28.06.2017
SK28.06.2017
SM28.06.2017
BG28.09.2017
NO28.09.2017
GR29.09.2017
IS28.10.2017
Former [2018/10]CZ28.06.2017
EE28.06.2017
FI28.06.2017
HR28.06.2017
LT28.06.2017
LV28.06.2017
NL28.06.2017
RO28.06.2017
RS28.06.2017
SE28.06.2017
SK28.06.2017
BG28.09.2017
NO28.09.2017
GR29.09.2017
Former [2018/09]EE28.06.2017
FI28.06.2017
HR28.06.2017
LT28.06.2017
LV28.06.2017
NL28.06.2017
RS28.06.2017
SE28.06.2017
BG28.09.2017
NO28.09.2017
GR29.09.2017
Former [2017/52]FI28.06.2017
HR28.06.2017
LT28.06.2017
LV28.06.2017
NL28.06.2017
RS28.06.2017
SE28.06.2017
BG28.09.2017
NO28.09.2017
GR29.09.2017
Former [2017/50]FI28.06.2017
HR28.06.2017
LT28.06.2017
LV28.06.2017
RS28.06.2017
SE28.06.2017
BG28.09.2017
NO28.09.2017
GR29.09.2017
Former [2017/49]FI28.06.2017
HR28.06.2017
LT28.06.2017
NO28.09.2017
GR29.09.2017
Documents cited:Search[XI]DE3446435  (ARWEILER WOLFGANG) [X] 1-5 * page 4, line 22 - line 33; figures 3-5 * [I] 6-10;
 [X]DE29510477U  (WFN GERAETEBAU GMBH [DE]; ENGELS WILLY GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-5 * page 1 - page 2; figures I-III *;
 [AD]DE1709020  (SCHOOP TRAUGOTT) [AD] 6-10 * page 4, paragraph 3; figures 1-3 *
by applicantDE1709020
 DE2918057