Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2617558

EP2617558 - A modular structural composite beam [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  22.02.2019
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  16.03.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  09.01.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip24.05.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): SI
published on 26.06.2019  [2019/26]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Blade Dynamics Limited
Saunders Drive Isle Of Wight
Cowes PO31 8HU / GB
[2018/16]
Former [2013/30]For all designated states
Blade Dynamics Limited
Saunders Drive Isle Of Wight
Cowes PO31 8HU / GB
Inventor(s)01 / Hayden, Paul Trevor
4 Corinthian Court
Cowes, Isle of White PO31 7SF / GB
02 / Behmer, Harald
27 College Road
Newport, Isle of White PO30 1HB / GB
 [2013/30]
Representative(s)Bedford, Grant Richard
GPO Europe
GE International Inc. The Ark
201 Talgarth Road
Hammersmith
London W6 8BJ / GB
[2018/16]
Former [2013/51]Boult Wade Tennant
Verulam Gardens
70 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8BT / GB
Former [2013/42]Draper, Martyn John , et al
Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8BT / GB
Former [2013/30]Palmer, Benjamin Jeffrey , et al
Boult Wade Tennant
70 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8BT / GB
Application number, filing date13164527.728.04.2011
[2013/30]
Priority number, dateGB2010000733630.04.2010         Original published format: GB 201007336
[2013/30]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2617558
Date:24.07.2013
Language:EN
[2013/30]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2617558
Date:18.04.2018
Language:EN
[2018/16]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP15.05.2013
ClassificationInternational:E04C3/29, B29C70/86, B29D99/00, F03D1/06, // B29L31/00, B29K105/24, B29L31/08
[2018/03]
Former International [2013/30]B29C70/86, B29D99/00, F03D1/06, // B29L31/00, B29L31/08, B29K105/24
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/16]
Former [2013/30]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:Modularer struktureller Verbundträger[2013/30]
English:A modular structural composite beam[2013/30]
French:Poutre de structure modulaire en matériau composite[2013/30]
Examination procedure21.01.2014Examination requested  [2014/10]
21.11.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.03.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.12.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
25.07.2016Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
05.08.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.01.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.03.2018Fee for grant paid
09.03.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
09.03.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP11719360.7  / EP2563573
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20110719360) is  14.11.2016
Opposition(s)21.01.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/13]
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
05.08.2016Request for further processing filed
05.08.2016Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
19.08.2016Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.04.2013Renewal fee patent year 03
23.04.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
23.04.2015Renewal fee patent year 05
02.05.2016Renewal fee patent year 06
02.05.2017Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL18.04.2018
AT18.04.2018
CZ18.04.2018
EE18.04.2018
FI18.04.2018
HR18.04.2018
IT18.04.2018
LT18.04.2018
LV18.04.2018
MC18.04.2018
NL18.04.2018
RO18.04.2018
RS18.04.2018
SE18.04.2018
SI18.04.2018
SK18.04.2018
SM18.04.2018
IE28.04.2018
LU28.04.2018
BE30.04.2018
CH30.04.2018
FR30.04.2018
LI30.04.2018
BG18.07.2018
GB18.07.2018
NO18.07.2018
GR19.07.2018
PT20.08.2018
[2019/26]
Former [2019/23]AL18.04.2018
AT18.04.2018
CZ18.04.2018
EE18.04.2018
FI18.04.2018
HR18.04.2018
IT18.04.2018
LT18.04.2018
LV18.04.2018
MC18.04.2018
NL18.04.2018
RO18.04.2018
RS18.04.2018
SE18.04.2018
SK18.04.2018
SM18.04.2018
IE28.04.2018
LU28.04.2018
BE30.04.2018
CH30.04.2018
FR30.04.2018
LI30.04.2018
BG18.07.2018
GB18.07.2018
NO18.07.2018
GR19.07.2018
PT20.08.2018
Former [2019/21]AL18.04.2018
AT18.04.2018
CZ18.04.2018
EE18.04.2018
FI18.04.2018
HR18.04.2018
IT18.04.2018
LT18.04.2018
LV18.04.2018
MC18.04.2018
NL18.04.2018
RO18.04.2018
RS18.04.2018
SE18.04.2018
SK18.04.2018
SM18.04.2018
IE28.04.2018
LU28.04.2018
BE30.04.2018
CH30.04.2018
LI30.04.2018
BG18.07.2018
GB18.07.2018
NO18.07.2018
GR19.07.2018
PT20.08.2018
Former [2019/19]AL18.04.2018
AT18.04.2018
CZ18.04.2018
EE18.04.2018
FI18.04.2018
HR18.04.2018
IT18.04.2018
LT18.04.2018
LV18.04.2018
MC18.04.2018
NL18.04.2018
RO18.04.2018
RS18.04.2018
SE18.04.2018
SK18.04.2018
SM18.04.2018
IE28.04.2018
LU28.04.2018
BE30.04.2018
CH30.04.2018
LI30.04.2018
BG18.07.2018
NO18.07.2018
GR19.07.2018
PT20.08.2018
Former [2019/11]AL18.04.2018
AT18.04.2018
CZ18.04.2018
EE18.04.2018
FI18.04.2018
HR18.04.2018
IT18.04.2018
LT18.04.2018
LV18.04.2018
MC18.04.2018
NL18.04.2018
RO18.04.2018
RS18.04.2018
SE18.04.2018
SK18.04.2018
SM18.04.2018
LU28.04.2018
BE30.04.2018
CH30.04.2018
LI30.04.2018
BG18.07.2018
NO18.07.2018
GR19.07.2018
PT20.08.2018
Former [2019/10]AL18.04.2018
AT18.04.2018
CZ18.04.2018
EE18.04.2018
FI18.04.2018
HR18.04.2018
LT18.04.2018
LV18.04.2018
MC18.04.2018
NL18.04.2018
RO18.04.2018
RS18.04.2018
SE18.04.2018
SK18.04.2018
LU28.04.2018
BG18.07.2018
NO18.07.2018
GR19.07.2018
PT20.08.2018
Former [2019/09]AL18.04.2018
EE18.04.2018
FI18.04.2018
HR18.04.2018
LT18.04.2018
LV18.04.2018
NL18.04.2018
RS18.04.2018
SE18.04.2018
LU28.04.2018
BG18.07.2018
NO18.07.2018
GR19.07.2018
PT20.08.2018
Former [2019/08]AL18.04.2018
FI18.04.2018
HR18.04.2018
LT18.04.2018
LV18.04.2018
NL18.04.2018
RS18.04.2018
SE18.04.2018
LU28.04.2018
BG18.07.2018
NO18.07.2018
GR19.07.2018
PT20.08.2018
Former [2019/03]AL18.04.2018
FI18.04.2018
HR18.04.2018
LT18.04.2018
LV18.04.2018
NL18.04.2018
RS18.04.2018
SE18.04.2018
BG18.07.2018
NO18.07.2018
GR19.07.2018
PT20.08.2018
Former [2018/52]AL18.04.2018
FI18.04.2018
HR18.04.2018
LT18.04.2018
LV18.04.2018
NL18.04.2018
RS18.04.2018
SE18.04.2018
BG18.07.2018
NO18.07.2018
GR19.07.2018
Former [2018/51]AL18.04.2018
FI18.04.2018
HR18.04.2018
LT18.04.2018
LV18.04.2018
NL18.04.2018
RS18.04.2018
SE18.04.2018
BG18.07.2018
NO18.07.2018
Former [2018/50]AL18.04.2018
FI18.04.2018
HR18.04.2018
LT18.04.2018
NL18.04.2018
SE18.04.2018
BG18.07.2018
NO18.07.2018
Former [2018/49]AL18.04.2018
FI18.04.2018
LT18.04.2018
NL18.04.2018
SE18.04.2018
BG18.07.2018
NO18.07.2018
Former [2018/47]AL18.04.2018
FI18.04.2018
LT18.04.2018
NL18.04.2018
NO18.07.2018
Former [2018/46]AL18.04.2018
LT18.04.2018
NL18.04.2018
NO18.07.2018
Former [2018/43]NL18.04.2018
Documents cited:Search[A]US4752513  (RAU ROBERT B [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * column 6, line 39 - column 7, line 9; figures 1,2 *;
 [A]WO9730651  (DU PONT [US]) [A] 1-15 * page 2, line 1 - line 16; figure 2 * * page 5, line 28 - page 8, line 15; figures 4a-4g *;
 [A]WO2005011964  (WOBBEN ALOYS [DE]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0030]; figure 4 *;
 [A]US3487518  (HOPFELD HENRY) [A] 1-15 * abstract *