Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2797291

EP2797291 - Traffic analysis for http user agent based device category mapping [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  23.12.2016
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip23.12.2016Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 25.01.2017  [2017/04]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ)
164 83 Stockholm / SE
[N/P]
Former [2014/44]For all designated states
Telefonaktiebolaget L M Ericsson (publ)
164 83 Stockholm / SE
Inventor(s)01 / KERSCH, Péter
Böszörményi u. 42
1126 Budapest / HU
02 / NEMETH, Gabor
Thököly u. 49
1146 Budapest / HU
03 / TOKA, Lásló
Rakoczi 23
1088 Budapest / HU
 [2014/44]
Representative(s)Ericsson
Patent Development
Torshamnsgatan 21-23
164 80 Stockholm / SE
[N/P]
Former [2014/44]Schwarz, Markku
Kraus & Weisert
Patentanwälte PartGmbB
Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15
80539 München / DE
Application number, filing date13164646.522.04.2013
[2014/44]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2797291
Date:29.10.2014
Language:EN
[2014/44]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.09.2013
ClassificationInternational:H04L29/08, H04L12/26
[2014/44]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/24]
Former [2014/44]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Verkehrsanalyse zur Vorrichtungskategorienabbildung auf HTTP-User-Agent-Basis[2014/44]
English:Traffic analysis for http user agent based device category mapping[2014/44]
French:Analyse de trafic pour mappage de catégorie de dispositif à base d'agent d'utilisateur HTTP[2014/44]
Examination procedure29.04.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
29.04.2015Examination requested  [2015/24]
15.12.2016Application withdrawn by applicant  [2017/04]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.04.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
27.04.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[AD]US2012240197  (TRAN DZUNG [US] ET AL) [AD] 1-15 * the whole document *
 [X]  - Sandvine, "Case Study: Sandvine TetheredDevice Detection Solution andService Revenue Enhancement", (20130403), URL: http://web.archive.org/web/20130403151208/http://www.sandvine.com/downloads/documents/Tethered%20Device%20Detection.pdf, (20130828), XP002711962 [X] 1-15 * abstract * * page 2, line 1 - page 3, line l * * figures 2,3 *
 [X]  - Steffen Schulz, Hossen A. Mustafa, Wenyuan Xu, Ahmad-Reza Sadeghi, Maria Zhdanova,Vijay Varadharajan, "Tetherway: A Framework for Tethering Camouflage", (20120418), URL: http://www.cse.sc.edu/~wyxu/papers/wisec66-schulz.pdf, (20130828), XP002711963 [X] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [02.1] * * paragraph [3.2.1] * * paragraph [3.3.1] * * figures 1-3 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/2185448.2185468
 [A]  - JAE YOON CHUNG ET AL, "Application traffic identification based on remote subnet grouping", NETWORK OPERATIONS AND MANAGEMENT SYMPOSIUM (APNOMS), 2012 14TH ASIA-PACIFIC, IEEE, (20120925), doi:10.1109/APNOMS.2012.6356066, ISBN 978-1-4673-4494-4, pages 1 - 8, XP032270842 [A] 1-15 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/APNOMS.2012.6356066
by applicantWO2012000020