blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2657568

EP2657568 - External rotation type power generation device having biased power generator [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  25.09.2015
Database last updated on 23.04.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip25.09.2015Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 28.10.2015  [2015/44]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Yang, Tai-Her
No. 59 Chung Hsing 8 Street
Si-Hu Town
Dzan-Hwa / TW
[2013/44]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2013/44]
Representative(s)Wright, Howard Hugh Burnby, et al
Withers & Rogers LLP
2 London Bridge
London SE1 9RA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2013/44]Wright, Howard Hugh Burnby, et al
Withers & Rogers LLP
4 More London Riverside
London
SE1 2AU / GB
Application number, filing date13164999.823.04.2013
[2013/44]
Priority number, dateUS20121345642426.04.2012         Original published format: US201213456424
[2013/44]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2657568
Date:30.10.2013
Language:EN
[2013/44]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2657568
Date:29.10.2014
Language:EN
[2014/44]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.09.2014
ClassificationIPC:F16H1/10, F16H1/22, F16H13/02
[2013/44]
CPC:
B62J6/12 (EP,US); H02K7/10 (KR); H02K7/18 (KR);
Y02E10/20 (EP,US); Y02E10/72 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2013/44]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Stromerzeugungsvorrichtung mit Außenrotation mit vorgespanntem Stromgenerator[2013/44]
English:External rotation type power generation device having biased power generator[2013/44]
French:Dispositif de génération d'alimentation de type à rotation externe doté d'un générateur de courant polarisé[2013/44]
Examination procedure30.04.2015Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2015/44]
08.06.2015Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2015/44]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.04.201503   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]US2003183034  (YANG TAI-HER [TW]) [X] 1-10* paragraphs [0044] , [0048]; figures 1-5,8,9,11,14,15,16,17,18,19,20 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.