blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2657169

EP2657169 - Folding pocket device for a pocket folder [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  29.04.2016
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip19.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 21.11.2018  [2018/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Maschinenbau Oppenweiler Binder GmbH & Co. KG
Grabenstrasse 4
71570 Oppenweiler / DE
[2015/26]
Former [2013/44]For all designated states
Maschinenbau Oppenweiler Binder GmbH & Co. KG
Grabenstrasse 4
71570 Oppenweiler / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Rohrbach, Jörg
Gothaweg 11
71672 Marbach / DE
02 / Redmer, Claus-Dieter
Rohrbachweg 1
71570 Oppenweiler / DE
 [2013/44]
Representative(s)Wächter, Jochen, et al
Kroher-Strobel
Rechts- und Patentanwälte PartmbB
Bavariaring 20
80336 München / DE
[2014/32]
Former [2013/44]Hano, Christian, et al
v. Füner Ebbinghaus Finck Hano Patentanwälte Mariahilfplatz 3
81541 München / DE
Application number, filing date13165047.524.04.2013
[2013/44]
Priority number, dateDE20121020703827.04.2012         Original published format: DE102012207038
[2013/44]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2657169
Date:30.10.2013
Language:DE
[2013/44]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2657169
Date:24.06.2015
Language:DE
[2015/26]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.07.2013
ClassificationIPC:B65H45/14, B65H45/00
[2015/04]
CPC:
B65H45/144 (EP,US); B65H45/00 (US); B65H45/04 (US);
B65H45/148 (EP,US)
Former IPC [2013/44]B65H45/14
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/26]
Former [2013/44]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:Falztaschenvorrichtung für eine Taschenfalzmaschine[2013/44]
English:Folding pocket device for a pocket folder[2013/44]
French:Dispositif de poches de pliage pour une plieuse à poches[2013/44]
Examination procedure30.04.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
30.04.2014Examination requested  [2014/24]
02.02.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.05.2015Fee for grant paid
12.05.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
12.05.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  02.02.2015
Opposition(s)29.03.2016No opposition filed within time limit [2016/22]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.04.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU24.04.2013
AL24.06.2015
CY24.06.2015
CZ24.06.2015
DK24.06.2015
EE24.06.2015
ES24.06.2015
FI24.06.2015
HR24.06.2015
IT24.06.2015
LT24.06.2015
LV24.06.2015
MC24.06.2015
MK24.06.2015
MT24.06.2015
NL24.06.2015
PL24.06.2015
RO24.06.2015
RS24.06.2015
SE24.06.2015
SI24.06.2015
SK24.06.2015
SM24.06.2015
TR24.06.2015
BG24.09.2015
NO24.09.2015
GR25.09.2015
IS24.10.2015
PT26.10.2015
[2018/47]
Former [2018/32]HU24.04.2013
CY24.06.2015
CZ24.06.2015
DK24.06.2015
EE24.06.2015
ES24.06.2015
FI24.06.2015
HR24.06.2015
IT24.06.2015
LT24.06.2015
LV24.06.2015
MC24.06.2015
MK24.06.2015
MT24.06.2015
NL24.06.2015
PL24.06.2015
RO24.06.2015
RS24.06.2015
SE24.06.2015
SI24.06.2015
SK24.06.2015
SM24.06.2015
TR24.06.2015
BG24.09.2015
NO24.09.2015
GR25.09.2015
IS24.10.2015
PT26.10.2015
Former [2018/29]HU24.04.2013
CY24.06.2015
CZ24.06.2015
DK24.06.2015
EE24.06.2015
ES24.06.2015
FI24.06.2015
HR24.06.2015
IT24.06.2015
LT24.06.2015
LV24.06.2015
MC24.06.2015
MK24.06.2015
NL24.06.2015
PL24.06.2015
RO24.06.2015
RS24.06.2015
SE24.06.2015
SI24.06.2015
SK24.06.2015
SM24.06.2015
TR24.06.2015
BG24.09.2015
NO24.09.2015
GR25.09.2015
IS24.10.2015
PT26.10.2015
Former [2018/28]HU24.04.2013
CY24.06.2015
CZ24.06.2015
DK24.06.2015
EE24.06.2015
ES24.06.2015
FI24.06.2015
HR24.06.2015
IT24.06.2015
LT24.06.2015
LV24.06.2015
MC24.06.2015
MK24.06.2015
NL24.06.2015
PL24.06.2015
RO24.06.2015
RS24.06.2015
SE24.06.2015
SI24.06.2015
SK24.06.2015
SM24.06.2015
BG24.09.2015
NO24.09.2015
GR25.09.2015
IS24.10.2015
PT26.10.2015
Former [2017/40]CZ24.06.2015
DK24.06.2015
EE24.06.2015
ES24.06.2015
FI24.06.2015
HR24.06.2015
IT24.06.2015
LT24.06.2015
LV24.06.2015
NL24.06.2015
PL24.06.2015
RO24.06.2015
RS24.06.2015
SE24.06.2015
SI24.06.2015
SK24.06.2015
BG24.09.2015
NO24.09.2015
GR25.09.2015
IS24.10.2015
PT26.10.2015
Former [2016/36]CZ24.06.2015
DK24.06.2015
EE24.06.2015
ES24.06.2015
FI24.06.2015
HR24.06.2015
IT24.06.2015
LT24.06.2015
LV24.06.2015
PL24.06.2015
RO24.06.2015
RS24.06.2015
SI24.06.2015
SK24.06.2015
BG24.09.2015
NO24.09.2015
GR25.09.2015
IS24.10.2015
PT26.10.2015
Former [2016/21]CZ24.06.2015
DK24.06.2015
EE24.06.2015
ES24.06.2015
FI24.06.2015
HR24.06.2015
IT24.06.2015
LT24.06.2015
LV24.06.2015
PL24.06.2015
RO24.06.2015
RS24.06.2015
SK24.06.2015
BG24.09.2015
NO24.09.2015
GR25.09.2015
IS24.10.2015
PT26.10.2015
Former [2016/20]CZ24.06.2015
DK24.06.2015
EE24.06.2015
ES24.06.2015
FI24.06.2015
HR24.06.2015
LT24.06.2015
LV24.06.2015
PL24.06.2015
RO24.06.2015
RS24.06.2015
SK24.06.2015
BG24.09.2015
NO24.09.2015
GR25.09.2015
IS24.10.2015
PT26.10.2015
Former [2016/10]CZ24.06.2015
EE24.06.2015
ES24.06.2015
FI24.06.2015
HR24.06.2015
LT24.06.2015
LV24.06.2015
PL24.06.2015
RO24.06.2015
RS24.06.2015
SK24.06.2015
BG24.09.2015
NO24.09.2015
GR25.09.2015
IS24.10.2015
PT26.10.2015
Former [2016/09]EE24.06.2015
FI24.06.2015
HR24.06.2015
LT24.06.2015
LV24.06.2015
RS24.06.2015
BG24.09.2015
NO24.09.2015
GR25.09.2015
Former [2015/50]FI24.06.2015
HR24.06.2015
LT24.06.2015
LV24.06.2015
RS24.06.2015
BG24.09.2015
NO24.09.2015
GR25.09.2015
Former [2015/49]FI24.06.2015
HR24.06.2015
LT24.06.2015
LV24.06.2015
RS24.06.2015
NO24.09.2015
GR25.09.2015
Documents cited:Search[AD]DE9211016U  (MATHIAS BÄUERLE GMBH) [AD] 1-8 * the whole document *;
 [A]DE4213519  (BAEUERLE GMBH MATHIAS [DE]) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *;
 [AD]EP1422178  (MASCHB OPPENWEILERBINDER GMBH [DE]) [AD] 3,8* abstract *;
 [A]JP2006062867  (SHOEI MACHINERY MFG CO LTD) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *;
 [XA]JP2007308209  (SHOEI MACHINERY MFG CO LTD) [X] 1,3,5,8 * abstract * [A] 2,4,6,7
by applicantDE3840856
 DE9211016U
 EP1422178
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.