blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2796233 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2796233



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 176
13.02.2019 Closing of application Search / examination 1
09.11.2018 Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) Search / examination 2
31.07.2018 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
31.07.2018 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
16.04.2018 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 7
16.04.2018 Claims Search / examination 5
16.04.2018 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
13.04.2018 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 7
13.04.2018 Claims Search / examination 5
13.04.2018 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
13.02.2018 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
13.02.2018 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
16.10.2017 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 5
16.10.2017 Claims Search / examination 5
16.10.2017 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
13.10.2017 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 5
13.10.2017 Claims Search / examination 5
13.10.2017 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
13.06.2017 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
13.06.2017 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
07.12.2016 Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
29.11.2016 General enquiry Search / examination 1
10.10.2016 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
29.09.2016 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
28.09.2016 Notification of termination of representative's authorisation Search / examination 2
19.08.2016 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
30.03.2016 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
30.03.2016 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
29.04.2015 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
29.04.2015 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
18.11.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
18.11.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
18.11.2014 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
18.11.2014 Written request for examination Search / examination 1
03.11.2014 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
01.10.2014 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
24.03.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
24.03.2014 Abstract Search / examination 1
24.03.2014 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 3
24.03.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
07.02.2014 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
29.11.2013 Annex to a communication Search / examination 2
29.11.2013 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
29.11.2013 European search opinion Search / examination 3
29.11.2013 European search report Search / examination 2
25.11.2013 Modified abstract Search / examination 1
18.11.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
18.11.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
18.11.2013 Reply to the invitation to clarify the claims/the subject matter of the application Search / examination 3
02.10.2013 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
02.10.2013 Invitation to indicate the subject-matter to be searched Search / examination 2
28.08.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
28.08.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
28.08.2013 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 2
13.08.2013 Deficiencies in request for rectification in designation of inventor Search / examination 2
05.08.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
05.08.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
05.08.2013 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
17.07.2013 Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor Search / examination 1
08.07.2013 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
24.04.2013 Abstract Search / examination 2
24.04.2013 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
24.04.2013 Claims Search / examination 6
24.04.2013 Description Search / examination 15
24.04.2013 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
24.04.2013 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
24.04.2013 Drawings Search / examination 15
24.04.2013 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 5