blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2796233


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
15.02.2019 Application deemed to be withdrawn published on  20.03.2019  [2019/12]
08.11.2018 New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit
10.08.2018 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
30.04.2018 New entry: Renewal fee paid
17.04.2018 New entry: Reply to examination report
23.02.2018 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
13.10.2017 New entry: Reply to examination report
23.06.2017 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
09.06.2017 First examination report
04.05.2017 New entry: Renewal fee paid
05.10.2016 Change - representative
23.09.2016 Change - representative
08.04.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
07.05.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
28.11.2014 Change - designated states published on  31.12.2014  [2015/01]
28.11.2014 Change - request for examination published on  31.12.2014  [2015/01]
28.10.2014 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  29.10.2014  [2014/44]
26.09.2014 Request for examination filed published on  29.10.2014  [2014/44]
25.03.2014 Amendment by applicant