blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2796233 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

CN201410166935 EP13165134



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
US2014318919Global Dossier 30.10.2014A1
Priority number Date
EP13165134 24.04.2013
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
JP2014213448Global Dossier 17.11.2014A
Priority number Date
EP13165134 24.04.2013
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
CN104117703Global Dossier 29.10.2014A
Priority number Date
EP13165134 24.04.2013
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP2796233Global Dossier 29.10.2014A1
Priority number Date
EP13165134 24.04.2013