Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2796233

EP2796233 - Coupling device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  15.02.2019
Database last updated on 15.06.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  09.06.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip15.02.2019Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 20.03.2019  [2019/12]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Hiestand, Karl
Äußerer Mühlweg 2
88630 Pfullendorf / DE
[2014/44]
Inventor(s)01 / Hiestand, Karl
Äußerer Mühlweg 2
88630 Pfullendorf / DE
02 / Hiestand, Markus
Mühlweg 3
88630 Pfullendorf / DE
 [2014/44]
Representative(s)Riebling, Peter
Patentanwalt Postfach 31 60
88113 Lindau / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/44]Engelhardt & Engelhardt
Patentanwälte Montafonstraße 35
88045 Friedrichshafen / DE
Application number, filing date13165134.124.04.2013
[2014/44]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2796233
Date:29.10.2014
Language:DE
[2014/44]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.11.2013
ClassificationInternational:B23B31/175, B23B31/28
[2014/44]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/44]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Koppelvorrichtung[2014/44]
English:Coupling device[2014/44]
French:Dispositif de couplage[2014/44]
Examination procedure24.03.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
18.11.2014Examination requested  [2015/01]
13.06.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
13.10.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.02.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
13.04.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
31.07.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
11.10.2018Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2019/12]
09.11.2018Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2019/12]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  13.06.2017
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.04.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
30.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
28.04.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
26.04.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[XDAI]EP2384839  (HIESTAND KARL [DE]) [XD] 1,6-8,10,11,14,15,17,18 [A] 12,13 [I] 16;
 [A]EP2103368  (HIESTAND KARL [DE]) [A] 1,19 * paragraph [0025]; figure - *
by applicantEP2384839