Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2796493

EP2796493 - Composition comprising silylated polymers and polyhedral oligomeric metallo silsesquioxane [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  20.03.2015
Database last updated on 22.07.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip20.03.2015Refusal of applicationpublished on 22.04.2015  [2015/17]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
HUNTSMAN INTERNATIONAL LLC
500 Huntsman Way
Salt Lake City, Utah 84108 / US
For all designated states
Huntsman (Europe) BVBA
Everslaan 45
3078 Everberg / BE
[2014/44]
Representative(s)Swinnen, Anne-Marie , et al
Huntsman (Europe) BVBA
Intellectual Property Department
Everslaan 45
3078 Everberg / BE
[2014/44]
Application number, filing date13165285.125.04.2013
[2014/44]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2796493
Date:29.10.2014
Language:EN
[2014/44]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.07.2013
ClassificationInternational:C08K5/549, C08L43/04, C08G18/22
[2014/44]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/44]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Zusammensetzung, umfassend silylierte Polymere und metallisierte polyhedrische oligomere silsequioxane[2014/44]
English:Composition comprising silylated polymers and polyhedral oligomeric metallo silsesquioxane[2014/44]
French:Composition comprenant des polymères silylés et silsesquioxanes oligomères polyhédriques métallisés[2014/44]
Examination procedure25.04.2013Examination requested  [2014/44]
25.11.2014Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: Examination on filing A.90(5) [2015/17]
05.12.2014Application refused, date of legal effect [2015/17]
Documents cited:Search[XI]US2005192364  (LICHTENHAN JOSEPH D [US], et al) [X] 1-4,9,12,14,15 * figure 2 * * example 5 * * paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0040] * [I] 1-15;
 [I]WO2008144735  (HYBRID PLASTICS INC [US]) [I] 1-15 * claims 1,2,6,14 * * figures 1,2 *;
 [I]US2010125123  (LICHTENHAN JOSEPH D [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * example - *
by applicantWO2011161011
 US4131731
 EP1396511
 US5994474
 WO2010013651
 WO2011075254
 DE102004055450
 US4333867
 WO03018704
 DE102008054434