Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
20.03.2015 | Refusal of application | published on 22.04.2015 [2015/17] |
25.11.2014 | New entry: Despatch of communication that application is refused | |
28.10.2014 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 29.10.2014 [2014/44] |
26.09.2014 | Request for examination filed | published on 29.10.2014 [2014/44] |