Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2796636

EP2796636 - Process for preparing a surface for decoration [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  26.08.2016
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 14.11.2018  [2018/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sika Technology AG
Zugerstrasse 50
6340 Baar / CH
[2014/44]
Inventor(s)01 / Hennemann, Pascal
Im Wienäckern 45
45721 Haltern / DE
02 / Schmidt, Henning
Ahornstrasse 45
45721 Haltern am See / DE
 [2014/44]
Representative(s)Sika Patent Attorneys
c/o Sika Technology AG
Corp. IP Dept.
Tüffenwies 16
Postfach
8048 Zürich / CH
[2014/44]
Application number, filing date13165499.826.04.2013
[2014/44]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2796636
Date:29.10.2014
Language:EN
[2014/44]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2796636
Date:21.10.2015
Language:EN
[2015/43]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.11.2013
ClassificationInternational:E04F13/02, B32B13/14
[2014/44]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/24]
Former [2014/44]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:Verfahren zum Vorbereiten einer Oberfläche zur Dekoration[2014/44]
English:Process for preparing a surface for decoration[2014/44]
French:Procédé de préparation d'une surface pour décoration[2014/44]
Examination procedure25.11.2014Examination requested  [2015/02]
20.05.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.09.2015Fee for grant paid
10.09.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
10.09.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  20.05.2015
Opposition(s)22.07.2016No opposition filed within time limit [2016/39]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.04.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU26.04.2013
AL21.10.2015
BG21.10.2015
CY21.10.2015
CZ21.10.2015
EE21.10.2015
HR21.10.2015
IT21.10.2015
LT21.10.2015
LV21.10.2015
MC21.10.2015
MK21.10.2015
PL21.10.2015
RO21.10.2015
RS21.10.2015
SI21.10.2015
SK21.10.2015
SM21.10.2015
TR21.10.2015
GR22.01.2016
IS21.02.2016
PT22.02.2016
IE26.04.2016
MT30.04.2016
FR02.05.2016
[2018/46]
Former [2018/45]HU26.04.2013
BG21.10.2015
CY21.10.2015
CZ21.10.2015
EE21.10.2015
HR21.10.2015
IT21.10.2015
LT21.10.2015
LV21.10.2015
MC21.10.2015
MK21.10.2015
PL21.10.2015
RO21.10.2015
RS21.10.2015
SI21.10.2015
SK21.10.2015
SM21.10.2015
TR21.10.2015
GR22.01.2016
IS21.02.2016
PT22.02.2016
IE26.04.2016
MT30.04.2016
FR02.05.2016
Former [2018/38]HU26.04.2013
BG21.10.2015
CY21.10.2015
CZ21.10.2015
EE21.10.2015
HR21.10.2015
IT21.10.2015
LT21.10.2015
LV21.10.2015
MC21.10.2015
MK21.10.2015
PL21.10.2015
RO21.10.2015
RS21.10.2015
SI21.10.2015
SK21.10.2015
SM21.10.2015
GR22.01.2016
IS21.02.2016
PT22.02.2016
IE26.04.2016
MT30.04.2016
FR02.05.2016
Former [2018/32]HU26.04.2013
CY21.10.2015
CZ21.10.2015
EE21.10.2015
HR21.10.2015
IT21.10.2015
LT21.10.2015
LV21.10.2015
MC21.10.2015
MK21.10.2015
PL21.10.2015
RO21.10.2015
RS21.10.2015
SI21.10.2015
SK21.10.2015
SM21.10.2015
GR22.01.2016
IS21.02.2016
PT22.02.2016
IE26.04.2016
MT30.04.2016
FR02.05.2016
Former [2018/30]HU26.04.2013
CY21.10.2015
CZ21.10.2015
EE21.10.2015
HR21.10.2015
IT21.10.2015
LT21.10.2015
LV21.10.2015
MC21.10.2015
MK21.10.2015
PL21.10.2015
RO21.10.2015
RS21.10.2015
SI21.10.2015
SK21.10.2015
SM21.10.2015
GR22.01.2016
IS21.02.2016
PT22.02.2016
IE26.04.2016
FR02.05.2016
Former [2017/38]CZ21.10.2015
EE21.10.2015
HR21.10.2015
IT21.10.2015
LT21.10.2015
LV21.10.2015
PL21.10.2015
RO21.10.2015
RS21.10.2015
SI21.10.2015
SK21.10.2015
SM21.10.2015
GR22.01.2016
IS21.02.2016
PT22.02.2016
IE26.04.2016
FR02.05.2016
Former [2017/10]CZ21.10.2015
EE21.10.2015
HR21.10.2015
IT21.10.2015
LT21.10.2015
LV21.10.2015
PL21.10.2015
RO21.10.2015
RS21.10.2015
SI21.10.2015
SK21.10.2015
SM21.10.2015
GR22.01.2016
IS21.02.2016
PT22.02.2016
FR02.05.2016
Former [2016/49]CZ21.10.2015
EE21.10.2015
HR21.10.2015
IT21.10.2015
LT21.10.2015
LV21.10.2015
PL21.10.2015
RO21.10.2015
RS21.10.2015
SI21.10.2015
SK21.10.2015
SM21.10.2015
GR22.01.2016
IS21.02.2016
PT22.02.2016
Former [2016/38]CZ21.10.2015
EE21.10.2015
HR21.10.2015
IT21.10.2015
LT21.10.2015
LV21.10.2015
PL21.10.2015
RO21.10.2015
RS21.10.2015
SK21.10.2015
SM21.10.2015
GR22.01.2016
IS21.02.2016
PT22.02.2016
Former [2016/36]CZ21.10.2015
EE21.10.2015
HR21.10.2015
IT21.10.2015
LT21.10.2015
LV21.10.2015
PL21.10.2015
RO21.10.2015
RS21.10.2015
SK21.10.2015
GR22.01.2016
IS21.02.2016
PT22.02.2016
Former [2016/34]CZ21.10.2015
HR21.10.2015
IT21.10.2015
LT21.10.2015
LV21.10.2015
PL21.10.2015
RS21.10.2015
GR22.01.2016
IS21.02.2016
PT22.02.2016
Former [2016/25]HR21.10.2015
IT21.10.2015
LT21.10.2015
LV21.10.2015
PL21.10.2015
RS21.10.2015
GR22.01.2016
IS21.02.2016
PT22.02.2016
Former [2016/24]HR21.10.2015
IT21.10.2015
LT21.10.2015
PL21.10.2015
RS21.10.2015
GR22.01.2016
IS21.02.2016
PT22.02.2016
Former [2016/23]HR21.10.2015
IT21.10.2015
LT21.10.2015
RS21.10.2015
IS21.02.2016
Former [2016/22]IT21.10.2015
LT21.10.2015
IS21.02.2016
Former [2016/21]IT21.10.2015
LT21.10.2015
Former [2016/20]LT21.10.2015
Documents cited:Search[A]GB2029765  (CARRS PAINTS LTD) [A] 1-12 * abstract *;
 [A]DE19848693  (SILINWERK VAN BAERLE & CO GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-12 * the whole document *;
 [A]DE3607438  (HORATSCH ERICH JADECOR [DE]) [A] 1-12 * abstract *;
 [A]GB2447578  (DOW GLOBAL TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [A] 1-12 * page 7, line 12 - line 20 *
by applicantUS3044919