Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2799359

EP2799359 - Cargo pallet comprising side boards and telescopic extension members [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  23.01.2015
Database last updated on 10.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip23.01.2015Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 25.02.2015  [2015/09]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Smart Flow Europe SA
78 Rue de la Royenne
7700 Mouscron / BE
[2014/45]
Inventor(s)01 / Delvigne, Christian
7 place Victor Hassebroucq
59200 Tourcoing / FR
02 / Vandewiele, Jan
24 avenue des Marronniers
7711 Dottignies / BE
 [2014/45]
Representative(s)Prugneau, Philippe , et al
Cabinet Prugneau-Schaub 3 avenue Doyen Louis Weil Le Grenat - EUROPOLE
38000 Grenoble / FR
[2014/45]
Application number, filing date13165826.229.04.2013
[2014/45]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2799359
Date:05.11.2014
Language:FR
[2014/45]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.09.2013
ClassificationInternational:B65D19/12, B65D19/16, B65D19/18
[2014/45]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/45]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Warentransportpalette, die mit Bordwänden und Teleskopaufsätzen ausgestattet ist[2014/45]
English:Cargo pallet comprising side boards and telescopic extension members[2014/45]
French:Palette de transport de marchandises comprenant des ridelles et des rehausses télescopiques[2014/45]
Examination procedure29.04.2013Examination requested  [2014/45]
19.01.2015Application withdrawn by applicant  [2015/09]
Documents cited:Search[X]WO2012004403  (ALTIA GROUP [FR], et al) [X] 1-8 * page 3, line 22 - page 8, line 35 * * figures 1-8 *;
 [X]US4714169  (KEENAN DANIEL J [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5-8 * column 3, line 20 - column 5, line 55; figures 1-8 *;
 [X]FR2458472  (RIGO FERDINAND [CH]) [X] 1,2,5-8 * page 2, line 17 - page 4, line 28 * * figures 1-4 *;
 [X]DE2506746  (FENDT & CO XAVER) [X] 1,2,6-8 * page 2, paragraphs 2,3 * * page 3, paragraph 6 - page 4, paragraph 3 * * figures 1-8 *;
 [X]US5370256  (FOURIE JOHANNES J [ZA], et al) [X] 1-6,9 * column 2, line 57 - column 5, line 25; figures 1-9 *;
 [X]US6585126  (GRIGSBY SR JOHN M [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4-6,8,9 * column 3, line 26 - column 10, line 13; figures 1-7 *;
 [X]US6123208  (HAENSZEL JAMES D [US]) [X] 1,8 * column 6, line 12 - line 36 * * figure 3 *
by applicantWO2012088090