Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2800261

EP2800261 - Mobile computing device comprising high voltage resonant DC-DC converter [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2014/45]High voltage resonant DC-DC converter
[2018/42]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  01.02.2019
Database last updated on 22.05.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  14.10.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  20.04.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip01.02.2019(Expected) grantpublished on 06.03.2019  [2019/10]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NXP B.V.
High Tech Campus 60
5656 AG Eindhoven / NL
[2014/45]
Inventor(s)01 / Pansier, Frans
Intellectual Property and Licensing
NXP Semiconductors
Red Central
60 High Street
Redhill, Surrey RH1 1NY / GB
 [2014/45]
Representative(s)Miles, John Richard , et al
NXP SEMICONDUCTORS
Intellectual Property Group
Abbey House
25 Clarendon Road
Redhill, Surrey RH1 1QZ / GB
[2019/10]
Former [2014/45]Miles, John Richard , et al
NXP Semiconductors
Intellectual Property and Licensing
Red Central
60 High Street
Redhill, Surrey RH1 1SH / GB
Application number, filing date13165828.829.04.2013
[2014/45]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2800261
Date:05.11.2014
Language:EN
[2014/45]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2800261
Date:06.03.2019
Language:EN
[2019/10]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.09.2013
ClassificationInternational:H02M3/158, G06F1/26
[2018/42]
Former International [2014/45]H02M3/158
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/25]
Former [2014/45]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:Mobile Datenverarbeitungsvorrichtung mit resonantem Hochspannungs-Gleichstromwandler[2018/42]
English:Mobile computing device comprising high voltage resonant DC-DC converter[2018/42]
French:Dispositif informatique mobile doté d'un convertisseur CC/CC haute tension à resonance[2018/42]
Former [2014/45]Resonanter Hochspannungs-Gleichstromwandler
Former [2014/45]High voltage resonant DC-DC converter
Former [2014/45]Convertisseur CC/CC haute tension à resonance
Examination procedure26.03.2014Examination requested  [2014/45]
09.09.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
24.04.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
24.08.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.10.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.01.2019Fee for grant paid
25.01.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
25.01.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  24.04.2018
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.04.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
02.05.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
02.05.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
30.04.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[XI]EP2445098  (ST MICROELECTRONICS SRL [IT]) [X] 1-5,8,10 * paragraphs [0023] , [0024]; figures 2,3 * [I] 15;
 [XYI]  - RIVETTA C ET AL, "HV resonant converter for photomultipliers tube bases", NUCLEAR SCIENCE SYMPOSIUM AND MEDICAL IMAGING CONFERENCE, 1992., CONFE RENCE RECORD OF THE 1992 IEEE ORLANDO, FL, USA 25-31 OCT. 1992, NEW YORK, NY, USA,IEEE, US, (19921025), doi:10.1109/NSSMIC.1992.301285, ISBN 978-0-7803-0884-8, pages 438 - 440, XP010108524 [X] 1-3,8-11 * page 439 - page 440; figures 2-4 * [Y] 12-14 [I] 15

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/NSSMIC.1992.301285
 [XI]  - GARCIA V ET AL, "Using the hybrid series-parallel resonant converter with capacitive output filter and with PWM phase-shifted control for high-voltage applications", INDUSTRIAL ELECTRONICS, CONTROL AND INSTRUMENTATION,, (19940905), vol. 3, doi:10.1109/IECON.1994.398063, ISBN 978-0-7803-1328-6, pages 1659 - 1664, XP010137631 [X] 1-3,6,8,10 * page 1659 - page 1664; figures 2,3,7-10,15 * [I] 7,15

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/IECON.1994.398063
 [Y]  - DMOWSKI A ET AL, "A novel series-resonant DC/DC converter with full control of output voltage at no-load condition-computer simulation based design aspects", PROCEEDINGS OF THE INDUSTRY APPLICATIONS SOCIETY ANNUAL MEETING. HOUSTON, OCT. 4 - 9, 1992; [PROCEEDINGS OF THE INDUSTRY APPLICATIONS SOCIETY ANNUAL MEETING], NEW YORK, IEEE, US, (19921004), vol. -, doi:10.1109/IAS.1992.244298, ISBN 978-0-7803-0635-6, pages 924 - 928, XP010063811 [Y] 12-14 * page 924 - page 925; figure 1b *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/IAS.1992.244298
 [A]  - O'MODHRAIN S, "TOUCH AND GO - DESIGNING HAPTIC FEEDBACK FOR A HAND-HELD MOBILE DEVICE", BT TECHNOLOGY JOURNAL, SPRINGER, DORDRECHT, NL, (20041004), vol. 22, no. 4, doi:10.1023/B:BTTJ.0000047592.21315.CE, ISSN 1358-3948, pages 139 - 145, XP001506469 [A] 1-15 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1023/B:BTTJ.0000047592.21315.ce
by applicantWO2009037613