Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2801450

EP2801450 - Device for remote actuation of a hand tool [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  02.10.2015
Database last updated on 22.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip02.10.2015Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 04.11.2015  [2015/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
HILTI Aktiengesellschaft
Feldkircherstrasse 100
9494 Schaan / LI
[2014/46]
Inventor(s)01 / Grazioli, Mario
Gemsweg 8
7000 Chur / CH
02 / Franz, Karl
Luegerstrasse 19
6800 Feldkirch / AT
03 / Stamm, Jörg
Kirchgasse 14
9470 Buchs / CH
04 / Infanger, Erich
Trutwis 9
7214 Grüsch / CH
05 / Baumgartner, Gerard
Zunhofweg 2
CH-6010 Kriens / CH
 [2014/46]
Representative(s)Hilti Aktiengesellschaft Corporate Intellectual Property
Feldkircherstrasse 100
Postfach 333
9494 Schaan / LI
[2014/46]
Application number, filing date13166624.006.05.2013
[2014/46]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2801450
Date:12.11.2014
Language:DE
[2014/46]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.11.2013
ClassificationInternational:B25H1/00, B25F5/02
[2014/46]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/46]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung zur Fernbetätigung eines Handwerkzeugs[2014/46]
English:Device for remote actuation of a hand tool[2014/46]
French:Dispositif d'actionnement à distance d'un outil manuel[2014/46]
Examination procedure06.05.2013Examination requested  [2014/46]
13.05.2015Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2015/45]
19.06.2015Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2015/45]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.05.201503   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XYI]US2012126560  (OCKLESTON JOHN [US]) [X] 1,2,4,6-8,10 * paragraphs [0040] - [0044]; figures 1,9 * [Y] 9 [I] 3,5;
 [Y]DE102010030219  (HILTI AG [LI]) [Y] 9 * paragraphs [0022] - [0035]; figure - *;
 [AD]EP1486294  (PROSPECTION & INVENTIONS [FR]) [AD] 1-10 * abstract *;
 [A]US4700876  (WINGERT RUDOLF [US]) [A] 1-10 * abstract *
by applicantEP1486294