Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2801700

EP2801700 - Guide apparatus for a turbine of an exhaust gas turbocharger [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  26.01.2018
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  17.03.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip26.01.2018Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 28.02.2018  [2018/09]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Bosch Mahle Turbo Systems GmbH & Co. KG
Löwentorstrasse 68
70376 Stuttgart / DE
[2014/46]
Inventor(s)01 / Thangavelu, Kanagaraj
27/1 Srinivasa Nagar, Veerapandi Piruvu
Jothipuram, Coimbatore
641047 Tamil Nadu / IN
 [2014/46]
Representative(s)BRP Renaud & Partner mbB Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte Steuerberater
Königstraße 28
70173 Stuttgart / DE
[2014/46]
Application number, filing date13166626.506.05.2013
[2014/46]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2801700
Date:12.11.2014
Language:EN
[2014/46]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP13.11.2013
ClassificationInternational:F01D5/14, F01D17/16, F02C6/12
[2014/46]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/18]
Former [2014/46]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Führungsvorrichtung für eine Turbine eines Abgasturboladers[2014/46]
English:Guide apparatus for a turbine of an exhaust gas turbocharger[2014/46]
French:Appareil de guidage pour une turbine d'un turbocompresseur à gaz d'échappement[2014/46]
Examination procedure17.03.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
17.03.2015Examination requested  [2015/18]
16.03.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
27.09.2017Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2018/09]
25.10.2017Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2018/09]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  16.03.2017
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.05.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
31.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
30.05.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[X]CN201474730U  (SHOUGUANG KANGYUE TURBOCHARGER CO LTD) [X] 1-13 * figures 4,5 *;
 [X]US2011268559  (LOMBARD ALAIN [FR] ET AL) [X] 1-3,5,6,8-13 * figures 5,6 *;
 [X]WO2012031381  (WANG HANG [CN]; LIU YING [CN]; WANG CONGCONG [CN]; ZHU ZHIFU [CN]; LI) [X] 1-5,8-10,12,13 * figures 8,9 *;
 [X]WO2012164227  (TURBOMECA [FR]; DEMOLIS JACQUES [FR]; MINEL LAURENT [FR]; VIGNAU HUBER) [X] 1,2,8-13 * figures 2, 3a *
by applicantDE102010047252