Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2801421

EP2801421 - Twist drill and method of manufacturing [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  09.10.2015
Database last updated on 22.07.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip09.10.2015Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 11.11.2015  [2015/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
HILTI Aktiengesellschaft
Feldkircherstrasse 100
9494 Schaan / LI
[2014/46]
Inventor(s)01 / Achleitner, Corinna
Flurgasse 20a
6800 Feldkirch / AT
02 / Domani, Günther
Kirchstr. 28 E
88138 Weissensberg / DE
03 / Winkler, Mark
Erlachstrasse 74
6845 Hohenems / AT
04 / Peters, Carsten
Eschagger 12
9468 Sax / CH
 [2014/46]
Representative(s)Hilti Aktiengesellschaft Corporate Intellectual Property
Feldkircherstrasse 100
Postfach 333
9494 Schaan / LI
[2014/46]
Application number, filing date13166671.106.05.2013
[2014/46]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2801421
Date:12.11.2014
Language:DE
[2014/46]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.10.2013
ClassificationInternational:B21H3/10, B23B51/02, E21B10/44
[2014/46]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/46]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Wendelbohrer und Herstellungsverfahren[2014/46]
English:Twist drill and method of manufacturing[2014/46]
French:Foret hélicoïdal et son procédé de fabrication[2014/46]
Examination procedure06.05.2013Examination requested  [2014/46]
13.05.2015Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2015/46]
23.06.2015Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2015/46]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.05.201503   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0470354  (FISCHER ARTUR WERKE GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *;
 [A]DE102011085187  (HILTI AG [LI]) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *;
 [A]FR2808462  (DIAGER [FR]) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP1621274  (BLACK & DECKER INC [US]) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *
by applicantUS7021872