Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2801609

EP2801609 - Spray-dried detergent powder [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  09.10.2015
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip09.10.2015Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 11.11.2015  [2015/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
The Procter & Gamble Company
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US
[2014/46]
Inventor(s)01 / Martinez-Guzman, Andres Arturo
Procter & Gamble Technical Centres Limited
Whitley Road
Longbenton
Newcastle upon Tyne, NE12 9TS / GB
02 / Tantawy, Hossam Hassan
Procter & Gamble Technical Centres Limited
Whitley Road
Longbenton
Newcastle upon Tyne, NE12 9TS / GB
03 / Porter, Adam
Procter & Gamble Technical Centres Limited
Whitley Road
Longbenton
Newcastle upon Tyne, NE12 9TS / GB
 [2014/46]
Representative(s)Howard, Phillip Jan
Procter & Gamble
Technical Centres Limited
Whitley Road
Longbenton
Newcastle upon Tyne NE12 9TS / GB
[2014/46]
Application number, filing date13166778.407.05.2013
[2014/46]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2801609
Date:12.11.2014
Language:EN
[2014/46]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP15.11.2013
ClassificationInternational:C11D17/06, C11D11/02, C11D3/04, C11D1/12, C11D3/37, C11D11/00
[2014/46]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/46]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Sprühgetrocknetes Waschmittelpulver[2014/46]
English:Spray-dried detergent powder[2014/46]
French:Poudre de détergent séchée par pulvérisation[2014/46]
Examination procedure07.05.2013Examination requested  [2014/46]
13.05.2015Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2015/46]
18.06.2015Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2015/46]
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.05.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[IY]EP0289311  (UNILEVER PLC [GB]; UNILEVER NV [NL]) [I] 1-13 * examples 1-3; claim - * [Y] 14,15;
 [Y]EP1914297  (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [Y] 14 * example 2; claim - *;
 [A]EP2336289  (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [A] 1-15 * example .; claims 1, 8, 11 *;
 [Y]EP1566431  (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [Y] 15 * paragraph [0031] *
by applicantBE680847