Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2801684

EP2801684 - Modular gear unit system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  30.09.2016
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 14.11.2018  [2018/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ROTO FRANK AG
Wilhelm-Frank-Platz 1
70771 Leinfelden-Echterdingen / DE
[2014/46]
Inventor(s)01 / Stapf, Peter
Schafgartenstrasse 6
70771 Leinfelden-Echterdingen / DE
 [2014/46]
Representative(s)Kohler Schmid Möbus Patentanwälte
Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB
Gropiusplatz 10
70563 Stuttgart / DE
[N/P]
Former [2015/48]Kohler Schmid Möbus Patentanwälte
Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB
Ruppmannstraße 27
70565 Stuttgart / DE
Former [2014/46]Kohler Schmid Möbus
Patentanwälte Ruppmannstraße 27
70565 Stuttgart / DE
Application number, filing date13166848.507.05.2013
[2014/46]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2801684
Date:12.11.2014
Language:DE
[2014/46]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2801684
Date:25.11.2015
Language:DE
[2015/48]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.11.2013
ClassificationInternational:E05C9/02
[2014/46]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/46]
TitleGerman:Getriebe-Baukastensystem[2014/46]
English:Modular gear unit system[2014/46]
French:Système modulaire d'engrenage[2014/46]
Examination procedure07.05.2014Examination requested  [2014/46]
15.04.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.05.2015Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
26.06.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.10.2015Fee for grant paid
07.10.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
07.10.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  15.04.2015
Opposition(s)26.08.2016No opposition filed within time limit [2016/44]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.05.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU07.05.2013
AL25.11.2015
BG25.11.2015
CY25.11.2015
DK25.11.2015
EE25.11.2015
FI25.11.2015
HR25.11.2015
IT25.11.2015
LT25.11.2015
LV25.11.2015
MC25.11.2015
MK25.11.2015
MT25.11.2015
NL25.11.2015
RO25.11.2015
SE25.11.2015
SK25.11.2015
SM25.11.2015
NO25.02.2016
GR26.02.2016
IS25.03.2016
PT25.03.2016
IE07.05.2016
LU07.05.2016
BE31.05.2016
[2018/46]
Former [2018/38]HU07.05.2013
BG25.11.2015
CY25.11.2015
DK25.11.2015
EE25.11.2015
FI25.11.2015
HR25.11.2015
IT25.11.2015
LT25.11.2015
LV25.11.2015
MC25.11.2015
MK25.11.2015
MT25.11.2015
NL25.11.2015
RO25.11.2015
SE25.11.2015
SK25.11.2015
SM25.11.2015
NO25.02.2016
GR26.02.2016
IS25.03.2016
PT25.03.2016
IE07.05.2016
LU07.05.2016
BE31.05.2016
Former [2018/32]HU07.05.2013
CY25.11.2015
DK25.11.2015
EE25.11.2015
FI25.11.2015
HR25.11.2015
IT25.11.2015
LT25.11.2015
LV25.11.2015
MC25.11.2015
MK25.11.2015
MT25.11.2015
NL25.11.2015
RO25.11.2015
SE25.11.2015
SK25.11.2015
SM25.11.2015
NO25.02.2016
GR26.02.2016
IS25.03.2016
PT25.03.2016
IE07.05.2016
LU07.05.2016
BE31.05.2016
Former [2018/30]HU07.05.2013
CY25.11.2015
DK25.11.2015
EE25.11.2015
FI25.11.2015
HR25.11.2015
IT25.11.2015
LT25.11.2015
LV25.11.2015
MC25.11.2015
MK25.11.2015
NL25.11.2015
RO25.11.2015
SE25.11.2015
SK25.11.2015
SM25.11.2015
NO25.02.2016
GR26.02.2016
IS25.03.2016
PT25.03.2016
IE07.05.2016
LU07.05.2016
BE31.05.2016
Former [2017/38]DK25.11.2015
EE25.11.2015
FI25.11.2015
HR25.11.2015
IT25.11.2015
LT25.11.2015
LV25.11.2015
NL25.11.2015
RO25.11.2015
SE25.11.2015
SK25.11.2015
SM25.11.2015
NO25.02.2016
GR26.02.2016
IS25.03.2016
PT25.03.2016
IE07.05.2016
LU07.05.2016
BE31.05.2016
Former [2017/04]DK25.11.2015
EE25.11.2015
FI25.11.2015
HR25.11.2015
IT25.11.2015
LT25.11.2015
LV25.11.2015
NL25.11.2015
RO25.11.2015
SE25.11.2015
SK25.11.2015
SM25.11.2015
NO25.02.2016
GR26.02.2016
IS25.03.2016
PT25.03.2016
LU07.05.2016
BE31.05.2016
Former [2016/39]DK25.11.2015
EE25.11.2015
FI25.11.2015
HR25.11.2015
IT25.11.2015
LT25.11.2015
LV25.11.2015
NL25.11.2015
RO25.11.2015
SE25.11.2015
SK25.11.2015
SM25.11.2015
NO25.02.2016
GR26.02.2016
IS25.03.2016
PT25.03.2016
BE31.05.2016
Former [2016/38]EE25.11.2015
FI25.11.2015
HR25.11.2015
IT25.11.2015
LT25.11.2015
LV25.11.2015
NL25.11.2015
RO25.11.2015
SE25.11.2015
SK25.11.2015
SM25.11.2015
NO25.02.2016
GR26.02.2016
IS25.03.2016
PT25.03.2016
BE31.05.2016
Former [2016/36]EE25.11.2015
FI25.11.2015
HR25.11.2015
IT25.11.2015
LT25.11.2015
LV25.11.2015
NL25.11.2015
RO25.11.2015
SE25.11.2015
SK25.11.2015
NO25.02.2016
GR26.02.2016
IS25.03.2016
PT25.03.2016
BE31.05.2016
Former [2016/25]FI25.11.2015
HR25.11.2015
LT25.11.2015
LV25.11.2015
NL25.11.2015
SE25.11.2015
NO25.02.2016
GR26.02.2016
IS25.03.2016
PT25.03.2016
Former [2016/24]FI25.11.2015
HR25.11.2015
LT25.11.2015
NL25.11.2015
SE25.11.2015
NO25.02.2016
GR26.02.2016
IS25.03.2016
PT25.03.2016
Former [2016/23]HR25.11.2015
LT25.11.2015
NL25.11.2015
SE25.11.2015
NO25.02.2016
IS25.03.2016
Former [2016/22]LT25.11.2015
NL25.11.2015
NO25.02.2016
IS25.03.2016
Former [2016/21]LT25.11.2015
NO25.02.2016
Former [2016/20]LT25.11.2015
Documents cited:Search[A]WO2008099261  (AMER S P A [IT], et al) [A] 1-11 * page 3, line 11 - page 5, line 1; figure 3 *;
 [A]GB1253736  (BENGTSSON SIGURD W [SE]) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP1619326  (GSG INT SPA [IT]) [A] 1-11 * figure 3 *;
 [A]US6450554  (ROTONDI ANTHONY J [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * column 4, line 66 - column 5, line 35; figure 1 *
by applicantDE1759040