Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2801706

EP2801706 - Internal combustion engine, with a system for variable actuation of the intake valves provided with a three-way electric valve having three levels of supplying current, and method for controlling this engine [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  21.04.2017
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip23.08.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): BG
published on 25.09.2019  [2019/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
C.R.F. Società Consortile per Azioni
Strada Torino, 50
10043 Orbassano (Torino) / IT
[2014/46]
Inventor(s)01 / Stucchi, Sergio
C.R.F. Società Consortile per Azioni
strada Torino 50
I-10043 Orbassano (Torino) / IT
02 / Ricco, Raffaele
C.R.F. Società Consortile per Azioni
strada Torino 50
I-10043 Orbassano (Torino) / IT
03 / De Michele, Onofrio
C.R.F. Società Consortile per Azioni
strada Torino 50
I-10043 Orbassano (Torino) / IT
04 / Gargano, Marcello
C.R.F. Società Consortile per Azioni
strada Torino 50
I-10043 Orbassano (Torino) / IT
05 / Puccio, Mitzi
C.R.F. Società Cosnoritle per Azioni
strada Torino 50
I-10043 Orbassano (Torino) / IT
06 / Lepore, Domenico
C.R.F. Società Consortile per Azioni
strada Torino 50
I-10043 Orbassano (Torino) / IT
 [2014/46]
Representative(s)Notaro, Giancarlo
Buzzi, Notaro & Antonielli d'Oulx
Corso Vittorio Emanuele ll, 6
10123 Torino / IT
[N/P]
Former [2014/46]Notaro, Giancarlo
Buzzi, Notaro & Antonielli d'Oulx Via Maria Vittoria 18
10123 Torino / IT
Application number, filing date13167181.009.05.2013
[2014/46]
Filing languageIT
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2801706
Date:12.11.2014
Language:EN
[2014/46]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2801706
Date:15.06.2016
Language:EN
[2016/24]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.11.2013
ClassificationInternational:F01L9/02
[2014/46]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/46]
TitleGerman:Brennkraftmaschine, mit einem System zur variablen Betätigung der Einlassventile, welches ausgerüstet ist mit einem elektrischen 3-Wegeventil, welches mit 3 unterschiedlichen Stromstärken bestromt werden kann, und verfahren zur Steuerung dieser Brennkraftmaschine.[2014/46]
English:Internal combustion engine, with a system for variable actuation of the intake valves provided with a three-way electric valve having three levels of supplying current, and method for controlling this engine[2014/46]
French:Moteur à combustion interne, avec un système de commande variable de soupape d'admission, pourvu d'une vanne à tiroir électrique à 3 voies, laquelle peut être alimentée avec 3 niveaux de courant, et méthode de contrôle de ce moteur.[2015/51]
Former [2014/46]Moteur à combustion interne, avec un système de commande variable de soupape d'admission, pourvu d'une vanne à tiroir électrique à trois voies, laquelle peut être alimentée avec trois niveaux de courant, et méthode de contrôle de ce moteur
Examination procedure25.03.2014Examination requested  [2014/46]
01.12.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.02.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.01.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.03.2016Fee for grant paid
22.03.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
26.04.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  01.12.2014
Opposition(s)16.03.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/21]
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.05.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
16.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU09.05.2013
AL15.06.2016
AT15.06.2016
BE15.06.2016
BG15.06.2016
CZ15.06.2016
DK15.06.2016
EE15.06.2016
ES15.06.2016
FI15.06.2016
HR15.06.2016
LT15.06.2016
LV15.06.2016
MC15.06.2016
NL15.06.2016
PL15.06.2016
RO15.06.2016
RS15.06.2016
SE15.06.2016
SI15.06.2016
SK15.06.2016
SM15.06.2016
NO15.09.2016
GR16.09.2016
IS15.10.2016
PT17.10.2016
[2019/39]
Former [2019/31]HU09.05.2013
AL15.06.2016
AT15.06.2016
BE15.06.2016
CZ15.06.2016
DK15.06.2016
EE15.06.2016
ES15.06.2016
FI15.06.2016
HR15.06.2016
LT15.06.2016
LV15.06.2016
MC15.06.2016
NL15.06.2016
PL15.06.2016
RO15.06.2016
RS15.06.2016
SE15.06.2016
SI15.06.2016
SK15.06.2016
SM15.06.2016
NO15.09.2016
GR16.09.2016
IS15.10.2016
PT17.10.2016
Former [2018/46]AL15.06.2016
AT15.06.2016
BE15.06.2016
CZ15.06.2016
DK15.06.2016
EE15.06.2016
ES15.06.2016
FI15.06.2016
HR15.06.2016
LT15.06.2016
LV15.06.2016
MC15.06.2016
NL15.06.2016
PL15.06.2016
RO15.06.2016
RS15.06.2016
SE15.06.2016
SI15.06.2016
SK15.06.2016
SM15.06.2016
NO15.09.2016
GR16.09.2016
IS15.10.2016
PT17.10.2016
Former [2018/06]AT15.06.2016
BE15.06.2016
CZ15.06.2016
DK15.06.2016
EE15.06.2016
ES15.06.2016
FI15.06.2016
HR15.06.2016
LT15.06.2016
LV15.06.2016
MC15.06.2016
NL15.06.2016
PL15.06.2016
RO15.06.2016
RS15.06.2016
SE15.06.2016
SI15.06.2016
SK15.06.2016
SM15.06.2016
NO15.09.2016
GR16.09.2016
IS15.10.2016
PT17.10.2016
Former [2017/38]AT15.06.2016
BE15.06.2016
CZ15.06.2016
DK15.06.2016
EE15.06.2016
ES15.06.2016
FI15.06.2016
HR15.06.2016
LT15.06.2016
LV15.06.2016
NL15.06.2016
PL15.06.2016
RO15.06.2016
RS15.06.2016
SE15.06.2016
SI15.06.2016
SK15.06.2016
SM15.06.2016
NO15.09.2016
GR16.09.2016
IS15.10.2016
PT17.10.2016
Former [2017/11]AT15.06.2016
BE15.06.2016
CZ15.06.2016
EE15.06.2016
ES15.06.2016
FI15.06.2016
HR15.06.2016
LT15.06.2016
LV15.06.2016
NL15.06.2016
PL15.06.2016
RO15.06.2016
RS15.06.2016
SE15.06.2016
SK15.06.2016
SM15.06.2016
NO15.09.2016
GR16.09.2016
IS15.10.2016
PT17.10.2016
Former [2017/10]BE15.06.2016
CZ15.06.2016
EE15.06.2016
FI15.06.2016
HR15.06.2016
LT15.06.2016
LV15.06.2016
NL15.06.2016
PL15.06.2016
RO15.06.2016
RS15.06.2016
SE15.06.2016
SK15.06.2016
NO15.09.2016
GR16.09.2016
IS15.10.2016
Former [2017/09]CZ15.06.2016
EE15.06.2016
FI15.06.2016
HR15.06.2016
LT15.06.2016
LV15.06.2016
NL15.06.2016
RO15.06.2016
RS15.06.2016
SE15.06.2016
NO15.09.2016
GR16.09.2016
Former [2016/52]FI15.06.2016
HR15.06.2016
LT15.06.2016
LV15.06.2016
NL15.06.2016
RS15.06.2016
SE15.06.2016
NO15.09.2016
GR16.09.2016
Former [2016/51]FI15.06.2016
HR15.06.2016
LT15.06.2016
LV15.06.2016
RS15.06.2016
NO15.09.2016
GR16.09.2016
Former [2016/50]FI15.06.2016
HR15.06.2016
LT15.06.2016
LV15.06.2016
RS15.06.2016
NO15.09.2016
Former [2016/49]FI15.06.2016
LT15.06.2016
NO15.09.2016
Former [2016/46]LT15.06.2016
NO15.09.2016
Documents cited:Search[A]US5499606  (ROBNETT JAMES T [US] ET AL) [A] 1,13 * column 1, line 6 - line 11 * * column 3, line 33 - line 54 * * figure 2 *;
 [AD]EP2261471  (FIAT RICERCHE [IT]) [AD] 1,11 * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0048] - paragraph [0049] * * figures 1,9-11 *;
 [A]US2006081213  (YANG ZHOU [US] ET AL) [A] 1,13 * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0073] - paragraph [0079] * * figures 12,13 *;
 [A]FR2375447  (MASCHF AUGSBURG NUERNBERG AG [DE]) [A] 1,13 * page 1, line 1 - line 8 * * page 6, line 11 - line 25 * * figure 3 *;
 [A]US2008149053  (HARMON MICHAEL P [US]) [A] 1,13 * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0029] * * paragraph [0034] * * figure 2 *
 [A]  - WANLIN H, "HYDRAULIC VALVE LIFT MECHANISM FOR AN ENGINE", RESEARCH DISCLOSURE, MASON PUBLICATIONS, HAMPSHIRE, GB, (20010101), no. 441, ISSN 0374-4353, page 106, XP001128018 [A] 1,13 * the whole document *
ExaminationEP2693007
 WO2014128526
 EP2597276
 EP2796675
by applicantEP0803642
 EP1555398
 EP1508676
 EP1674673
 EP2261471
 EP1726790
 EP1674673
 EP20110190639
 EP20120178720
 EP20130165631