Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2801915

EP2801915 - ADAPTIVE INTERFACE FOR COUPLING OF FPGA MODULES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2014/46]Adaptive interface for coupling of FPGA modules
[2016/38]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  24.11.2017
Database last updated on 19.10.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  16.12.2016
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  09.12.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip18.10.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY
published on 20.11.2019 [2019/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
dSPACE digital signal processing and control engineering GmbH
Rathenaustraße 26
33102 Paderborn / DE
[2014/46]
Inventor(s)01 / Hasse, Dirk
Vauss-Kamp 24
33154 Salzkotten / DE
02 / Polnau, Robert
Trebnitzer Strasse 37
33098 Paderborn / DE
 [2014/46]
Representative(s)Michalski Hüttermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB
Speditionstraße 21
40221 Düsseldorf / DE
[2014/46]
Application number, filing date13167208.110.05.2013
[2014/46]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2801915
Date:12.11.2014
Language:DE
[2014/46]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2801915
Date:18.01.2017
Language:DE
[2017/03]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.10.2013
ClassificationInternational:G06F13/42, G05B19/042
[2014/46]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/26]
Former [2014/46]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:ADAPTIVES INTERFACE ZUR KOPPLUNG VON FPGA-MODULEN[2016/38]
English:ADAPTIVE INTERFACE FOR COUPLING OF FPGA MODULES[2016/38]
French:INTERFACE ADAPTATIVE POUR LE COUPLAGE DE MODULES FPGA[2016/38]
Former [2014/46]Adaptives Interface zur Kopplung von FPGA-Modulen
Former [2014/46]Adaptive interface for coupling of FPGA modules
Former [2014/46]Interface adaptative pour le couplage de modules FPGA
Examination procedure12.05.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
12.05.2015Examination requested  [2015/26]
25.08.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.12.2016Fee for grant paid
06.12.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
06.12.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  25.08.2016
Opposition(s)19.10.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/52]
Fees paidRenewal fee
01.06.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
31.05.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU10.05.2013
CY18.01.2017
CZ18.01.2017
DK18.01.2017
EE18.01.2017
ES18.01.2017
FI18.01.2017
HR18.01.2017
IT18.01.2017
LT18.01.2017
LV18.01.2017
MC18.01.2017
MT18.01.2017
NL18.01.2017
PL18.01.2017
RO18.01.2017
RS18.01.2017
SE18.01.2017
SI18.01.2017
SK18.01.2017
SM18.01.2017
BG18.04.2017
NO18.04.2017
GR19.04.2017
GB10.05.2017
IE10.05.2017
LU10.05.2017
IS18.05.2017
PT18.05.2017
BE31.05.2017
CH31.05.2017
FR31.05.2017
LI31.05.2017
[2019/47]
Former [2019/31]HU10.05.2013
CZ18.01.2017
DK18.01.2017
EE18.01.2017
ES18.01.2017
FI18.01.2017
HR18.01.2017
IT18.01.2017
LT18.01.2017
LV18.01.2017
MC18.01.2017
MT18.01.2017
NL18.01.2017
PL18.01.2017
RO18.01.2017
RS18.01.2017
SE18.01.2017
SI18.01.2017
SK18.01.2017
SM18.01.2017
BG18.04.2017
NO18.04.2017
GR19.04.2017
GB10.05.2017
IE10.05.2017
LU10.05.2017
IS18.05.2017
PT18.05.2017
BE31.05.2017
CH31.05.2017
FR31.05.2017
LI31.05.2017
Former [2018/43]CZ18.01.2017
DK18.01.2017
EE18.01.2017
ES18.01.2017
FI18.01.2017
HR18.01.2017
IT18.01.2017
LT18.01.2017
LV18.01.2017
MC18.01.2017
MT18.01.2017
NL18.01.2017
PL18.01.2017
RO18.01.2017
RS18.01.2017
SE18.01.2017
SI18.01.2017
SK18.01.2017
SM18.01.2017
BG18.04.2017
NO18.04.2017
GR19.04.2017
GB10.05.2017
IE10.05.2017
LU10.05.2017
IS18.05.2017
PT18.05.2017
BE31.05.2017
CH31.05.2017
FR31.05.2017
LI31.05.2017
Former [2018/39]CZ18.01.2017
DK18.01.2017
EE18.01.2017
ES18.01.2017
FI18.01.2017
HR18.01.2017
IT18.01.2017
LT18.01.2017
LV18.01.2017
MC18.01.2017
NL18.01.2017
PL18.01.2017
RO18.01.2017
RS18.01.2017
SE18.01.2017
SI18.01.2017
SK18.01.2017
SM18.01.2017
BG18.04.2017
NO18.04.2017
GR19.04.2017
GB10.05.2017
IE10.05.2017
LU10.05.2017
IS18.05.2017
PT18.05.2017
BE31.05.2017
CH31.05.2017
FR31.05.2017
LI31.05.2017
Former [2018/29]CZ18.01.2017
DK18.01.2017
EE18.01.2017
ES18.01.2017
FI18.01.2017
HR18.01.2017
IT18.01.2017
LT18.01.2017
LV18.01.2017
MC18.01.2017
NL18.01.2017
PL18.01.2017
RO18.01.2017
RS18.01.2017
SE18.01.2017
SI18.01.2017
SK18.01.2017
SM18.01.2017
BG18.04.2017
NO18.04.2017
GR19.04.2017
GB10.05.2017
IE10.05.2017
LU10.05.2017
IS18.05.2017
PT18.05.2017
CH31.05.2017
FR31.05.2017
LI31.05.2017
Former [2018/21]CZ18.01.2017
DK18.01.2017
EE18.01.2017
ES18.01.2017
FI18.01.2017
HR18.01.2017
IT18.01.2017
LT18.01.2017
LV18.01.2017
MC18.01.2017
NL18.01.2017
PL18.01.2017
RO18.01.2017
RS18.01.2017
SE18.01.2017
SI18.01.2017
SK18.01.2017
SM18.01.2017
BG18.04.2017
NO18.04.2017
GR19.04.2017
GB10.05.2017
LU10.05.2017
IS18.05.2017
PT18.05.2017
CH31.05.2017
LI31.05.2017
Former [2018/17]CZ18.01.2017
DK18.01.2017
EE18.01.2017
ES18.01.2017
FI18.01.2017
HR18.01.2017
IT18.01.2017
LT18.01.2017
LV18.01.2017
MC18.01.2017
NL18.01.2017
PL18.01.2017
RO18.01.2017
RS18.01.2017
SE18.01.2017
SI18.01.2017
SK18.01.2017
SM18.01.2017
BG18.04.2017
NO18.04.2017
GR19.04.2017
LU10.05.2017
IS18.05.2017
PT18.05.2017
CH31.05.2017
LI31.05.2017
Former [2018/14]CZ18.01.2017
DK18.01.2017
EE18.01.2017
ES18.01.2017
FI18.01.2017
HR18.01.2017
IT18.01.2017
LT18.01.2017
LV18.01.2017
MC18.01.2017
NL18.01.2017
PL18.01.2017
RO18.01.2017
RS18.01.2017
SE18.01.2017
SI18.01.2017
SK18.01.2017
SM18.01.2017
BG18.04.2017
NO18.04.2017
GR19.04.2017
IS18.05.2017
PT18.05.2017
CH31.05.2017
LI31.05.2017
LU31.05.2017
Former [2018/06]CZ18.01.2017
DK18.01.2017
EE18.01.2017
ES18.01.2017
FI18.01.2017
HR18.01.2017
IT18.01.2017
LT18.01.2017
LV18.01.2017
MC18.01.2017
NL18.01.2017
PL18.01.2017
RO18.01.2017
RS18.01.2017
SE18.01.2017
SK18.01.2017
SM18.01.2017
BG18.04.2017
NO18.04.2017
GR19.04.2017
IS18.05.2017
PT18.05.2017
LU31.05.2017
Former [2017/51]CZ18.01.2017
DK18.01.2017
EE18.01.2017
ES18.01.2017
FI18.01.2017
HR18.01.2017
IT18.01.2017
LT18.01.2017
LV18.01.2017
NL18.01.2017
PL18.01.2017
RO18.01.2017
RS18.01.2017
SE18.01.2017
SK18.01.2017
SM18.01.2017
BG18.04.2017
NO18.04.2017
GR19.04.2017
IS18.05.2017
PT18.05.2017
LU31.05.2017
Former [2017/50]CZ18.01.2017
DK18.01.2017
EE18.01.2017
ES18.01.2017
FI18.01.2017
HR18.01.2017
IT18.01.2017
LT18.01.2017
LV18.01.2017
NL18.01.2017
PL18.01.2017
RO18.01.2017
RS18.01.2017
SE18.01.2017
SK18.01.2017
BG18.04.2017
NO18.04.2017
GR19.04.2017
IS18.05.2017
PT18.05.2017
LU31.05.2017
Former [2017/49]CZ18.01.2017
EE18.01.2017
ES18.01.2017
FI18.01.2017
HR18.01.2017
IT18.01.2017
LT18.01.2017
LV18.01.2017
NL18.01.2017
PL18.01.2017
RO18.01.2017
RS18.01.2017
SE18.01.2017
SK18.01.2017
BG18.04.2017
NO18.04.2017
GR19.04.2017
IS18.05.2017
PT18.05.2017
LU31.05.2017
Former [2017/48]CZ18.01.2017
ES18.01.2017
FI18.01.2017
HR18.01.2017
LT18.01.2017
LV18.01.2017
NL18.01.2017
PL18.01.2017
RS18.01.2017
SE18.01.2017
BG18.04.2017
NO18.04.2017
GR19.04.2017
IS18.05.2017
PT18.05.2017
LU31.05.2017
Former [2017/40]ES18.01.2017
FI18.01.2017
HR18.01.2017
LT18.01.2017
LV18.01.2017
NL18.01.2017
PL18.01.2017
RS18.01.2017
SE18.01.2017
BG18.04.2017
NO18.04.2017
GR19.04.2017
IS18.05.2017
PT18.05.2017
LU31.05.2017
Documents cited:Search[Y]DE20307308U  (DBT AUTOM GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1-15 * abstract *;
 [Y]EP1168187  (COPYER CO [JP] CANON FINETECH INC [JP]) [Y] 1-15 * paragraphs [0012] - [0016]; figures 2,3 *;
 [A]US7268582  (ZHENG MICHAEL M [US] ET AL) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0003] - [0005] *;
 [A]DE102011052512  (DSPACE GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0006] - [0011] *;
 [A]JPH04322347  (TOSHIBA CORP; TOSHIBA TSUSHIN SYST ENG) [A] 1-15 * abstract *