Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2801915 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2801915



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 208
22.11.2017 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
18.01.2017 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
22.12.2016 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
06.12.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
06.12.2016 English translation of the claims Search / examination 5
06.12.2016 French translation of claims Search / examination 4
06.12.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
25.08.2016 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
25.08.2016 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
25.08.2016 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
25.08.2016 Text intended for grant Search / examination 33
25.08.2016 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 33
29.07.2016 Examination started Search / examination 1
15.05.2015 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 5
15.05.2015 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 5
15.05.2015 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
15.05.2015 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 3
15.05.2015 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 10
12.05.2015 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 5
12.05.2015 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 5
12.05.2015 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
12.05.2015 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 3
12.05.2015 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 10
17.11.2014 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
15.10.2014 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
04.10.2013 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
04.10.2013 European search opinion Search / examination 5
04.10.2013 European search report Search / examination 2
16.09.2013 Search started Search / examination 1
05.07.2013 Drawings Search / examination 4
05.07.2013 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
05.07.2013 Reply to the invitation to remedy deficiencies Search / examination 1
13.06.2013 Deficiencies in application documents - annex C Search / examination 3
11.06.2013 Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor Search / examination 1
11.06.2013 Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor Search / examination 1
29.05.2013 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
29.05.2013 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
13.05.2013 Letter relating to the automatic debiting procedure Search / examination 1
10.05.2013 Abstract Search / examination 1
10.05.2013 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
10.05.2013 Claims Search / examination 5
10.05.2013 Description Search / examination 23
10.05.2013 Drawings Search / examination 4
10.05.2013 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 4