Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2801915 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

CN201410089777 EP13167208



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
US9160338Global Dossier 13.10.2015B2
US2014333344 13.11.2014A1
Priority number Date
EP13167208 10.05.2013
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
JP6104210BGlobal Dossier 29.03.2017B2
JP2014220813 20.11.2014A
Priority number Date
EP13167208 10.05.2013
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
CN104142902BGlobal Dossier 29.08.2017B
CN104142902 12.11.2014A
Priority number Date
EP13167208 10.05.2013
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP2801915Global Dossier 18.01.2017B1
EP2801915 12.11.2014A1
Priority number Date
EP13167208 10.05.2013