Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2803363

EP2803363 - The antigen CYBA-72Y/B15 and uses thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  09.02.2018
Database last updated on 21.10.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  03.03.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  24.02.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip18.10.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY
published on 20.11.2019 [2019/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Universitätsmedizin der Johannes Gutenberg-Universität Mainz
Langenbeckstraße 1
55131 Mainz / DE
[2014/47]
Inventor(s)01 / Wölfel, Catherine
Albanusstraße 47
55128 Mainz / DE
02 / Domning, Sabine
45 Stanthorpe Road
SW16 2DZ London / GB
03 / Lennerz, Volker
An der Schwarzen Hecke 15
55270 Ober-Olm / DE
04 / Wölfel, Thomas
Albanusstraße 47
55128 Mainz / DE
05 / Distler, Eva
Mauerstrasse 11
64289 Darmstadt / DE
06 / Herr, Wolfgang
Hechtsheimer Straße 64
55131 Mainz / DE
 [2014/47]
Representative(s)Krauss, Jan
Boehmert & Boehmert
Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB
Pettenkoferstrasse 22
80336 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/47]Krauss, Jan
Boehmert & Boehmert
Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB
Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte
Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22
80336 München / DE
Application number, filing date13167550.613.05.2013
[2014/47]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2803363
Date:19.11.2014
Language:EN
[2014/47]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2803363
Date:05.04.2017
Language:EN
[2017/14]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.10.2013
ClassificationInternational:A61K39/00, A61P37/06, A61P35/00, A61P35/02
[2014/47]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/18]
Former [2014/47]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:Das Antigen CYBA-72Y/B15 und Verwendungen davon[2014/47]
English:The antigen CYBA-72Y/B15 and uses thereof[2014/47]
French:Antigène CYBA-72Y/B15 et leurs utilisations[2014/47]
Examination procedure20.03.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
20.03.2015Examination requested  [2015/18]
23.11.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.03.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.10.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.02.2017Fee for grant paid
21.02.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
21.02.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  23.11.2015
Opposition(s)08.01.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/11]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.05.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
21.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU13.05.2013
AT05.04.2017
CY05.04.2017
CZ05.04.2017
DK05.04.2017
EE05.04.2017
ES05.04.2017
FI05.04.2017
HR05.04.2017
IT05.04.2017
LT05.04.2017
LV05.04.2017
MC05.04.2017
NL05.04.2017
PL05.04.2017
RO05.04.2017
RS05.04.2017
SE05.04.2017
SI05.04.2017
SK05.04.2017
SM05.04.2017
IE13.05.2017
LU13.05.2017
MT13.05.2017
BE31.05.2017
CH31.05.2017
LI31.05.2017
BG05.07.2017
NO05.07.2017
GR06.07.2017
IS05.08.2017
[2019/47]
Former [2019/31]HU13.05.2013
AT05.04.2017
CZ05.04.2017
DK05.04.2017
EE05.04.2017
ES05.04.2017
FI05.04.2017
HR05.04.2017
IT05.04.2017
LT05.04.2017
LV05.04.2017
MC05.04.2017
NL05.04.2017
PL05.04.2017
RO05.04.2017
RS05.04.2017
SE05.04.2017
SI05.04.2017
SK05.04.2017
SM05.04.2017
IE13.05.2017
LU13.05.2017
MT13.05.2017
BE31.05.2017
CH31.05.2017
LI31.05.2017
BG05.07.2017
NO05.07.2017
GR06.07.2017
IS05.08.2017
Former [2018/43]AT05.04.2017
CZ05.04.2017
DK05.04.2017
EE05.04.2017
ES05.04.2017
FI05.04.2017
HR05.04.2017
IT05.04.2017
LT05.04.2017
LV05.04.2017
MC05.04.2017
NL05.04.2017
PL05.04.2017
RO05.04.2017
RS05.04.2017
SE05.04.2017
SI05.04.2017
SK05.04.2017
SM05.04.2017
IE13.05.2017
LU13.05.2017
MT13.05.2017
BE31.05.2017
CH31.05.2017
LI31.05.2017
BG05.07.2017
NO05.07.2017
GR06.07.2017
IS05.08.2017
Former [2018/39]AT05.04.2017
CZ05.04.2017
DK05.04.2017
EE05.04.2017
ES05.04.2017
FI05.04.2017
HR05.04.2017
IT05.04.2017
LT05.04.2017
LV05.04.2017
MC05.04.2017
NL05.04.2017
PL05.04.2017
RO05.04.2017
RS05.04.2017
SE05.04.2017
SI05.04.2017
SK05.04.2017
SM05.04.2017
IE13.05.2017
LU13.05.2017
BE31.05.2017
CH31.05.2017
LI31.05.2017
BG05.07.2017
NO05.07.2017
GR06.07.2017
IS05.08.2017
Former [2018/25]AT05.04.2017
CZ05.04.2017
DK05.04.2017
EE05.04.2017
ES05.04.2017
FI05.04.2017
HR05.04.2017
IT05.04.2017
LT05.04.2017
LV05.04.2017
MC05.04.2017
NL05.04.2017
PL05.04.2017
RO05.04.2017
RS05.04.2017
SE05.04.2017
SI05.04.2017
SK05.04.2017
SM05.04.2017
IE13.05.2017
LU13.05.2017
CH31.05.2017
LI31.05.2017
BG05.07.2017
NO05.07.2017
GR06.07.2017
IS05.08.2017
Former [2018/17]AT05.04.2017
CZ05.04.2017
DK05.04.2017
EE05.04.2017
ES05.04.2017
FI05.04.2017
HR05.04.2017
IT05.04.2017
LT05.04.2017
LV05.04.2017
MC05.04.2017
NL05.04.2017
PL05.04.2017
RO05.04.2017
RS05.04.2017
SE05.04.2017
SK05.04.2017
SM05.04.2017
LU13.05.2017
CH31.05.2017
LI31.05.2017
BG05.07.2017
NO05.07.2017
GR06.07.2017
IS05.08.2017
Former [2018/11]AT05.04.2017
CZ05.04.2017
DK05.04.2017
EE05.04.2017
ES05.04.2017
FI05.04.2017
HR05.04.2017
IT05.04.2017
LT05.04.2017
LV05.04.2017
MC05.04.2017
NL05.04.2017
PL05.04.2017
RO05.04.2017
RS05.04.2017
SE05.04.2017
SK05.04.2017
SM05.04.2017
CH31.05.2017
LI31.05.2017
BG05.07.2017
NO05.07.2017
GR06.07.2017
IS05.08.2017
Former [2018/10]AT05.04.2017
CZ05.04.2017
DK05.04.2017
EE05.04.2017
ES05.04.2017
FI05.04.2017
HR05.04.2017
LT05.04.2017
LV05.04.2017
MC05.04.2017
NL05.04.2017
PL05.04.2017
RO05.04.2017
RS05.04.2017
SE05.04.2017
SK05.04.2017
BG05.07.2017
NO05.07.2017
GR06.07.2017
IS05.08.2017
Former [2018/09]AT05.04.2017
DK05.04.2017
EE05.04.2017
ES05.04.2017
FI05.04.2017
HR05.04.2017
LT05.04.2017
LV05.04.2017
NL05.04.2017
PL05.04.2017
RS05.04.2017
SE05.04.2017
BG05.07.2017
NO05.07.2017
GR06.07.2017
IS05.08.2017
Former [2017/50]AT05.04.2017
ES05.04.2017
FI05.04.2017
HR05.04.2017
LT05.04.2017
LV05.04.2017
NL05.04.2017
PL05.04.2017
RS05.04.2017
SE05.04.2017
BG05.07.2017
NO05.07.2017
GR06.07.2017
IS05.08.2017
Former [2017/49]AT05.04.2017
ES05.04.2017
FI05.04.2017
HR05.04.2017
LT05.04.2017
NL05.04.2017
NO05.07.2017
GR06.07.2017
IS05.08.2017
Former [2017/48]NL05.04.2017
Documents cited:Search[X]WO02064798  (BIONOMICS LTD [AU]; KREMMIDIOTIS GABRIEL [AU]; BAIS ANTHONY JOHN [AU];) [X] 7-9,14 * claim 68 *
 [XI]  - "SubName: Full=Cytochrome b-245 light chain; Flags: Fragment;", UniProt, (20120418), Database accession no. H3BPX1, URL: EBI, XP002714313 [X] 1,2 * sequence . * [I] 4-6
 [XI]  - UniParc, (20060913), Database accession no. UPI0000E02E96, URL: Uniprot, XP002714314 [X] 1-3 * the whole document * [I] 4-6
 [AD]  - FENG X ET AL, "Targeting minor histocompatibility antigens in graft versus tumor or graft versus leukemia responses", TRENDS IN IMMUNOLOGY, ELSEVIER LTD. TRENDS JOURNALS, GB, vol. 29, no. 12, doi:10.1016/J.IT.2008.09.004, ISSN 1471-4906, (20081201), pages 624 - 632, (20081025), XP025681420 [AD] 1-15 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.it.2008.09.004
 [A]  - AKATSUKA YOSHIKI ET AL, "Minor histocompatibility antigens as targets for immunotherapy using allogeneic immune reactions.", CANCER SCIENCE, (200708), vol. 98, no. 8, ISSN 1347-9032, pages 1139 - 1146, XP002714315 [A] 1-15 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1349-7006.2007.00521.x
    [ ] - "Human cytochrome B-245 alpha polypeptide (CYBA).", Geneseq, (20021213), Database accession no. AAE26668, URL: EBI [ ] * sequence . *
by applicantUS6830883
 US6521598
 US7008922